Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Margareta, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Flores, Don, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Hacker, Aleta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Appearances by Pet w/Atty. Divorce facts proved. Personal property: pip Name restored to wife. Decree signed. Appearances by Pet w/Atty. Divorce facts proved. Personal property: pip Name restored to wife. Decree signed. Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Docket /Walk-ins (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hacker, Aleta)
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Don Don Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request For Issuance
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition copy to S. Darnell copy to S. Darnell Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Don Flores Don Flores Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed with Clerk 3/14/2014 Flores, Don Served 03/13/2014 Returned 03/14/2014 Filed with Clerk 3/14/2014 Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Hacker, Aleta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.