Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Womack, Joe, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Hunter Thomas Hillin, against Ranger Care Center, Distinguished Health Care Inc., Individually And D B A Ranger Care Center, represented by G Michael Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Amended Filing Amended Filing |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Distinguished Health Care Inc., Individually and d/b/a Ranger Care Center Unserved | |
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Distinguished Health Care Distinguished Health Care |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request For Issuance | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Petition Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.