Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eaves, Stephanie, Rutherford, Michelle, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Greg Allen, against Cascade-Abilene Health Services, Ltd Dba Silver Spring Health & Rehab Ctr, represented by Travis P Clardy, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas)
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Envelope
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Letter
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Of Dismissal
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Amended Petition
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Scheduling Order
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Mtn (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Plaintiff's' Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Plaintiff's' Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.