Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Tolliver, Lucky, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Craig D. Zips, against Robben Foods, Inc., represented by Michael B Mckinney, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeler, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Non Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice With Prejudice Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Other Settled per Cade Browning 02/22/2010 Reset by Court to 04/19/2010 04/19/2010 Reset by Court to 10/04/2010 Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas)
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing (2 c. to atty M. McKinney) (2 c. to atty M. McKinney) Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion For Pre-Trial Hearing (c. to atty M. McKinney) (c. to atty M. McKinney) Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Pretrial Conference; (c. to atty J. Befort) of Pretrial Conference; (c. to atty J. Befort) Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reporter Certification Deposition of Merlyn D. Moore, Ph. D. Deposition of Merlyn D. Moore, Ph. D. Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reporter Certification Deposition of Jim Hom, Ph. D. Deposition of Jim Hom, Ph. D. Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas)
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement (1 c. to Cade Browning) (1 c. to Cade Browning) Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.