Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lyons Drilling, Inc., filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Derrick M. Saulberry, against Rigco Training Services, Llc, Boyd, William, represented by C. Craig Jones, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeler, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts, Notes |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Dismissal Notice
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Posted Dismissal Notice Derrick M. Saulsberry Derrick M. Saulsberry Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned Envelope Dismissal Notice to Derrick Saulberry; bad address; to be posted Dismissal Notice to Derrick Saulberry; bad address; to be posted Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion For Withdrawal Of Counsel (2 c. to C. Craig Jones) (2 c. to C. Craig Jones) Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Mtn (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) motion to withdraw counsel/ telephonic motion to withdraw counsel/ telephonic Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Counsel Counsel Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion To Quash And For Protective Order And For Protective Order Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Written Discovery Plaintiffs' Plaintiffs' Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer And Cross Action William Boyd, d/b/a Rigco Services William Boyd, d/b/a Rigco Services Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.