Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Byrd R&S Oilfield Services, Lp, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Melanie L. Hollmann, against Star Of Texas Energy Services, Inc., represented by Robert R Durbin, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeler, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2007 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts, Notes |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Discovery
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Denied Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Mtn to Transfer Venue and Orig Answer 03/07/2008 Reset by Court to 04/10/2008 Mtn to Transfer Venue and Orig Answer Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff's, To Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Plaintiff's, To Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Hearing
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer and Alternatively Original Answer to Transfer and Alternatively Original Answer Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Return filed with clerk 01/14/2008 Star of Texas Energy Services, Inc. Served 01/08/2008 Returned 01/14/2008 Return filed with clerk 01/14/2008 Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.