Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2018 |
CategoryModification-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 05/28/2019
Date: May 28, 2019Citation-ISSUED ON CHRISTINA ROMERO-On 08/21/2020
Date: August 20, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: September 06, 2018Citation-ISSUED ON REED BECKER-On 09/11/2018
Date: September 06, 2018Citation Tr# 3 RET EXEC(REED BECKER) On 09/17/2018
Date: September 21, 2018RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2019P-T DKT CTRL SCHED ORD/FINAL SET 9-3-19@1:30PM
Date: May 02, 2019AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE
Date: May 28, 2019AUSTIN FORM
Date: May 28, 2019CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR - CHRISTINA ROMERO
Date: July 15, 2020T.R.O.-ISSUED ON REED BECKER. H/R 09/24/2018 - 09:00-On 09/11/2018
Date: September 06, 2018TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD/9-24-18 @9AM
Date: September 11, 2018QDRO - CHEVRON EMPLOYEE SAVINGS INVESTMENT PLAN
Date: June 20, 2019RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2020AGREED TEMP ORDS
Date: September 20, 2018T.R.O. Tr# 5 RET EXEC(REED BECKER) On 09/17/2018
Date: September 21, 2018Citation Tr# 32 RET EXEC(CHRISTINA ROMERO) On 08/25/2020
Date: August 28, 2020PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: August 20, 2020ORDER FOR DRUG TESTING - REED BECKER
Date: October 02, 2020MOTION FOR TEMP ORDERS
Date: October 15, 2020NOTICE OF HRG FOR TEMP ORD/HRG 9-25-2020/8:30AM
Date: September 16, 2020MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER FOR DRUG TESTING
Date: September 28, 2020RESP'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: October 30, 20201ST AMD PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: October 19, 2020(PROP)NOH ON MOT FOR TEMP ORDS/ATTACHED TO MOT
Date: October 15, 2020CONFIRM LTR FROM ATTY Z.MCNULTY (12/10/2020 @ 8:30AM)
Date: November 18, 2020RESP'S OBJECTIONS TO PTNR'S REQUEST FOR EXPARTE TRO
Date: October 19, 2020CONFIRM LTR FROM ATTY D.SMITH (12/10/2020 @ 8:30 AM)
Date: November 18, 2020(PROPOSED) TRO AND ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORDERS
Date: October 19, 2020NOTICE OF HRG FOR TEMP ORDS (11-18-20/8:30)
Date: October 23, 2020ORD ON MOT FOR SUB OF COUNSEL (ATTY V BAILEY)
Date: October 16, 2020CIVIL INFO SHEET
Date: September 06, 2018(PROP) ORDER FOR DRUG TESTING
Date: September 25, 2020(PROPOSED) ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: October 02, 2020SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: August 20, 2020MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL - ATTY ZENA MCNULTY
Date: October 02, 2020SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: September 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CONFIRM LTR FROM ATTY Z.MCNULTY (12/10/2020 @ 8:30AM) | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CONFIRM LTR FROM ATTY D.SMITH (12/10/2020 @ 8:30 AM) | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RESP'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HRG FOR TEMP ORDS (11-18-20/8:30) | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | 1ST AMD PETITION TO MODIFY PCR | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RESP'S OBJECTIONS TO PTNR'S REQUEST FOR EXPARTE TRO | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) TRO AND ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORDERS | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD ON MOT FOR SUB OF COUNSEL (ATTY V BAILEY) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMP ORDERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.