Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryModification-Custody |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
ORDER ON MOT FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2018WAIVER OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2017Citation W/SVC Tr# 2 RET OTHER(NOE LUZ GUZMAN) On 01/04/2017
Date: January 04, 2017NOTICE OF FINAL TRIAL-5/4/17@100PM
Date: March 03, 2017CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION
Date: May 04, 2017APPEARANCE - AMBER DANIELLE GUZMAN
Date: May 04, 2017T.R.O.-ISSUED ON NOE LUZ GUZMAN. H/R 05/14/2018 - 10:00-On 04/30/2018
Date: April 26, 2018MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION IN SMPCR
Date: April 26, 2018TRO/ORDER SETTING HRG FOR TO/05-14-18@10AM
Date: April 30, 2018Citation Tr# 21 RET EXEC(NOE LUZ GUZMAN) On 05/10/2018
Date: May 11, 2018APPEARANCE - AMBER DANIELLE GUZMAN
Date: May 15, 2018(PROPOSED)ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT
Date: November 28, 2018Citation Tr# 20 RET EXEC(AMBER DANIELLE HENDRIX) On 05/03/2018
Date: May 09, 2018NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: November 28, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: November 28, 2018RETURNED ENVELOPE - AMBER DANIELLE GUZMAN
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 11/30/2018
Date: November 30, 2018FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC:PTNR)
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT/DECREE/NOE GUZMAN
Date: May 23, 2017STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COURT COSTS
Date: December 30, 2016PRO SE INSTRUCTION SHEET
Date: December 30, 2016Citation-ISSUED ON AMBER DANIELLE HENDRIX-On 04/30/2018
Date: April 26, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 23, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: December 30, 2016Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON NOE LUZ GUZMAN-On 12/30/2016
Date: December 30, 2016T.R.O.-ISSUED ON AMBER DANIELLE HENDRIX. H/R 05/14/2018 - 10:00-On 04/30/2018
Date: April 26, 2018CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: April 26, 2018SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: April 26, 2018Citation-ISSUED ON NOE LUZ GUZMAN-On 04/30/2018
Date: April 26, 2018AUSTIN FORM
Date: May 23, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 25 RET EXEC(NOE LUZ GUZMAN) On 05/10/2018
Date: May 11, 2018T.R.O. Tr# 24 RET EXEC(AMBER DANIELLE HENDRIX) On 05/03/2018
Date: May 09, 2018AJ'S REPORT
Date: May 14, 2018ACCUTRACE TEST REQUEST FORM-AMBER HENDRIX
Date: May 14, 2018COURT SERVICES ORDER(CC:FCS)
Date: May 14, 2018APPEARANCE - NOE LUZ GUZMAN
Date: May 15, 2018CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 30, 2016BLUE CARD
Date: November 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED ENVELOPE - AMBER DANIELLE GUZMAN | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 11/30/2018 | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED)ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE - AMBER DANIELLE GUZMAN | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE - NOE LUZ GUZMAN | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AJ'S REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.