Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
*** From 231-395582-05 *** AJ'S ORD RESET 4-13-06
Date: March 02, 2006ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: January 07, 2013*** From 231-395582-05 *** APPEARANCE H.V.
Date: March 07, 2006*** From 231-395582-05 *** Deposit on Cost Report/
Date: September 25, 2008*** From 231-395582-05 *** FILING, SUIT AFFECTING
Date: December 30, 2005*** From 231-395582-05 *** Citation W/SVC-ISSUED O
Date: December 30, 2005IV-D APPROVAL OF C/S ORDER/WAIVE SVC MARIA VAZQUEZ
Date: October 21, 2015*** From 231-395582-05 *** ORD IN SUIT AFFECT THE
Date: April 13, 2006DOCKET SHEET
Date: April 26, 2013IV-D CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER(CONFIRM ARREARS
Date: October 21, 2015CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: October 21, 2015*** From 231-395582-05 *** ORDER ON MOTION TO CONS
Date: April 26, 2013Costbill (Collections) for $17 HECTOR VAZQUEZ LOPE
Date: December 08, 2015DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 27, 2015Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1
Date: November 04, 2015INFORMATION SHEET
Date: January 07, 2013RESPONDENT'S APPEARANCE (HECTOR V LOPEZ)
Date: April 26, 2013FNAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC: ALL-ATTY)
Date: April 26, 2013CHILD SUPPORT REV ORDER (CONFIRMATION OF ARREARS &
Date: October 27, 2015BLUE CARD
Date: October 27, 2015CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: April 26, 2013Costbill (AG Only) for $17 HECTOR VAZQUEZ
Date: November 04, 2015*** From 231-395582-05 *** Check in/out index card
Date: April 13, 2006*** From 231-395582-05 *** APPEARANCE - FAM DIST C
Date: May 09, 2006IV-D APPROVAL OF C/S ORDER/WAIVE SVC HECTOR VAZQUE
Date: October 21, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 40, dated 10/21/2015 | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 44, dated 10/21/2015 | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED-HECTOR LOPEZ | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $17 HECTOR VAZQUEZ LOPE | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1 | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Costbill (AG Only) for $17 HECTOR VAZQUEZ | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT REV ORDER (CONFIRMATION OF ARREARS & | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.