Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
INVESTIGATIVE REPORT
Date: December 28, 2012IV-D CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER(SUIT AFFECTING THE
Date: December 28, 2012HEALTH INSURANCE AVAILABILITY FORM
Date: December 28, 2012CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: December 28, 2012RETURNED ENVELOPE - MARCEL DUVAL BATTLE
Date: October 31, 2013Costbill (Collections) for $258 MARCEL DUVAL BATTL
Date: February 04, 2013INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 28, 2012DOCKET SHEET
Date: December 28, 2012Costbill (AG Only) for $258 MARCEL DUVAL BATTLE
Date: January 03, 2013CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER FINAL CC ALL PARTIES
Date: December 28, 2012Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o
Date: October 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURNED ENVELOPE - MARCEL DUVAL BATTLE | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 1, dated 12/28/2012 | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $258 MARCEL DUVAL BATTL | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Costbill (AG Only) for $258 MARCEL DUVAL BATTLE | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | INVESTIGATIVE REPORT | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | IV-D CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER(SUIT AFFECTING THE | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | HEALTH INSURANCE AVAILABILITY FORM | |
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.