Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2011 |
CategoryPost Judgment Title Iv-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
IV-D SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP
Date: August 18, 2017INFORMATION SHEET (ORIG COPY CROOKED ON PAGE)
Date: May 16, 2011CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: August 18, 2017EMPLOYERS ORDER TO W/HOLD INCOME (CC:PTNR M/RESP
Date: August 31, 2011CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: August 31, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: May 16, 2011WAIVER OF SERVICE/CITATION (BRADLEY LASSETTER)
Date: August 31, 2011APPLICATION TO FILE PET W/O PAYMENT OF COST &
Date: May 16, 2011DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC: PTNR M/RESP)
Date: August 31, 2011Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1
Date: December 05, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: August 31, 2011PRO SE INSTRUCTION SHEET
Date: May 16, 2011APPEARANCE - BRADLEY SCOTT LASSETTER
Date: December 05, 2017IV-D Citation Tr# 20 RET EXEC(BRADLEY SCOTT LASSET
Date: September 25, 2017IV-D NOTICE OF HEARING(11/30/17 @ 815AM)
Date: October 17, 2017IV-D TARRANT COUNTY SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: August 18, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON JENNIFER RAE LASSETTER-On
Date: August 18, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: November 30, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: November 30, 2017Costbill (AG Only) for $304 BRADLEY SCOTT LASSETTE
Date: December 05, 2017COLLECTIONS NOTIFICATION OF PAYMENT SCHEDULE
Date: December 22, 20171ST AMD NOT OF CHANGE OF STATUS & MOT FOR FURT ORD
Date: August 20, 2021Clerk's Certification Project Default-Created on 0
Date: July 21, 2020PARENT CENTER (KIDS FIRST/JENNIFER LASSETTER)
Date: August 31, 2011IV-D SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT ORDER
Date: January 12, 2021IV-D ID SHEET(BSL)
Date: August 18, 2017IV-D Citation Tr# 19 RET EXEC(JENNIFER RAE LASSETT
Date: September 21, 2017Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o
Date: December 15, 2018Costbill (Collections) for $198 BRADLEY SCOTT LASS
Date: May 11, 2018IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON BRADLEY SCOTT LASSETTER,
Date: August 18, 2017DEFAULT ORD IN SAPCR, SUIT FOR MOD & ORD CONFIRM
Date: November 30, 2017IV-D ID SHEET(JRL)
Date: August 18, 2017IV-D IV-D RETURN OF SERVICE(BSL)
Date: September 25, 2017IV-D ZOOM HEARING NOTICE (08/16/21 830AM)
Date: August 11, 2021IV-D RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2017IV-D TC SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: January 12, 2021IV-D ZOOM HRG NOT (10/25/21 @ 3:30P) ZOOM MEETING
Date: October 20, 2021IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 48 RET EXEC(BRADLEY SCOTT
Date: February 08, 2021RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER - JENNIFER RAE LASSET
Date: February 08, 2021IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 49 RET EXEC(JENNIFER RAE S
Date: January 28, 2021Costbill (AG Only) for $394 BRADLEY SCOTT LASSETTE
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1
Date: October 26, 2021Costbill (Collections) for $394 BRADLEY SCOTT LASS
Date: December 14, 2021Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o
Date: March 02, 2022IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON JENNIFER RAE
Date: January 12, 2021IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON BRADLEY SCOTT
Date: January 12, 2021DEFAULT ORDER ON NOTICE OF CHANGED STATUS
Date: October 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $394 BRADLEY SCOTT LASS | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Costbill (AG Only) for $394 BRADLEY SCOTT LASSETTE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1 | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ORDER ON NOTICE OF CHANGED STATUS | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | IV-D ZOOM HRG NOT (10/25/21 @ 3:30P) ZOOM MEETING | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | 1ST AMD NOT OF CHANGE OF STATUS & MOT FOR FURT ORD | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | IV-D ZOOM HEARING NOTICE (08/16/21 830AM) | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 52, dated 02/08/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.