Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Cherami J. Blaney Jenkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2010 |
CategoryModification-Custody |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP
Date: July 31, 2014ORDER ON MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DKT & PRETRIAL
Date: April 24, 2012AUSTIN FORM/MAILED 11-26-14
Date: November 25, 2014MOT APPT ATTY AD LITEM AFTER PUBLICATION
Date: May 09, 2012CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: November 24, 2014ORDER IN SMPCR (CC: ALL-ATTY)
Date: November 24, 2014DOCKET SHEET
Date: November 24, 2014WAIVER OF SVC/LORI LOVE
Date: November 12, 2014NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 04/24/2012 Image ID
Date: February 28, 2012ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD REL/CC:
Date: July 13, 2012CITATION PUB Tr# 26 RET EXEC(UNKNOWN FATHER) On 03
Date: April 13, 20123RD AMENDED PET IN SAPCR
Date: February 29, 2012CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS (LORI LOVE)
Date: July 16, 2012CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: July 13, 2012APPT OF ATTY AD LITEM AFTER PUB (CHERAMI JENKINS)
Date: May 15, 2012DOCKET SHEET
Date: July 13, 2012RETURNED ENVELOPE/ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN/ORDER IN
Date: September 04, 20121ST AMENDED ANSWER OF ATTY AD LITEM (CHERAMI
Date: June 29, 2012MOT/RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET (HRG 4-24-12 @9:30)
Date: March 29, 2012ORIG ANSW FILED BY ATTY AD LITEM FOR RESP CITED
Date: May 23, 2012ORIG PET IN SAPCR/REQUEST TEMP ORD/ORD SET HRG
Date: September 23, 2010NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 01/24/2012 Image ID
Date: November 28, 2011TRO AND ORD SET HRG TEMP ORD (HRG 10-6-10/8:30AM)
Date: September 23, 2010MOT/FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF (HRG 7-1-11 @9:30AM)
Date: May 26, 2011REPORT OF ATTY AD LITEM (TRACI WILKINSON)
Date: June 07, 20112ND AMENDED PETITION IN SAPCR
Date: August 12, 2011APPT/ATTY AD LITEM AFTER PUB/TRACI WILKINSON)
Date: February 16, 2011LETTER FROM ATTY ESTES RE:APPT OF ADL AFTER PUBL
Date: December 20, 2010Citation-ISSUED ON LORI LOVE-On 08/12/2011
Date: August 12, 2011CITATION PUB-ISSUED ON LORI LOVE-On 11/02/2010
Date: October 29, 2010ORIG ANSW FILED BY ATTY AD LITEM FOR RESP CITED
Date: May 13, 2011MOT FOR APPT OF ATTY AD LITEM AFTER PUB (HRG_)
Date: December 17, 2010ASSOC/JDG'S REPORT-INTERIM EMERGENCY ORDER
Date: October 06, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | AUSTIN FORM/MAILED 11-26-14 | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILE TRANSACTION FEE | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #53 | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER IN SMPCR (CC: ALL-ATTY) | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SVC/LORI LOVE | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILE TRANSACTION FEE | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.