Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPaternity Iv-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/19/2006 Image ID
Date: August 31, 2006CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET
Date: September 26, 2006NOTICE/APPROVAL ON NONSUIT(PET TO ESTAB THE PCR)
Date: September 26, 2006Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON ERNEST VILLEGAS-On
Date: December 30, 2005FILING, PATERNITY OR VOLUNTARY PATERNITY SUIT
Date: December 30, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event | ***FILE SENT TO RECORDS *** | |
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET | |
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE/APPROVAL ON NONSUIT(PET TO ESTAB THE PCR) | |
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/19/2006 Image ID | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 2, dated 12/30/2005 | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 1, dated 12/30/2005 | |
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Adjustment for service fee from # 2 | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON ERNEST VILLEGAS-On | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | FILING, PATERNITY OR VOLUNTARY PATERNITY SUIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.