Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Other Civil, Other case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Thomas W. Lowe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil, Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
PRO SE SANCHEZ NOT/HRG 6/30/21 @ 1:30 W/RECEIPT
Date: May 17, 2021***ORD OF RECUSAL
Date: July 02, 2021***ORD OF TRANSFER DUE TO RECUSAL
Date: July 09, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE - VERIFIED MTN FOR RECUSAL
Date: July 06, 2021VERIFIED MTN FOR RECUSAL JUDGE TOME LOWE
Date: June 30, 2021MOT TO 1ST AMD PETITION
Date: June 14, 2021Subpoena W/SVC Tr# 8 RET EXEC On 05/07/2021
Date: May 12, 2021PPRO SE NOT+MTN/DEFAULT JDG+NOT+MTN/DEFAULT JDG
Date: May 04, 2021APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA
Date: May 04, 2021STATEMENT/INABILITY TO AFFORD COST
Date: May 04, 2021CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(SPIRAL DINER & BAKERY) On 04/14/2021
Date: April 19, 2021Subpoena W/SVC-ISSUED ON SPIRAL DINER & BAKERY-On 05/05/2021
Date: May 04, 2021CIT-ISSUED ON SPIRAL DINER & BAKERY-On 04/13/2021
Date: April 09, 2021CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: April 08, 2021SVC REQ FORM
Date: April 08, 2021PLTFS ORIG PET
Date: April 08, 2021STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF CT COSTS OR AN APPEAL BOND
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ***ORD OF TRANSFER DUE TO RECUSAL | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - VERIFIED MTN FOR RECUSAL | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COPIES - CIVIL | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #25 | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ***ORD OF RECUSAL | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | VERIFIED MTN FOR RECUSAL JUDGE TOME LOWE | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PRO SE PROOF OF SVC (MTN TO 1ST AMD PET) | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MOT TO 1ST AMD PETITION | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PRO SE SANCHEZ NOT/HRG 6/30/21 @ 1:30 W/RECEIPT | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.