Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
(PROPOSED) CPTNR'S NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORD
Date: May 28, 2021RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER- SHARON CHANDLER
Date: May 28, 2021(PROPOSED) ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: May 28, 2021COUNTERPETITIONER'S NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORDS 6/30/21 @ 2:30PM
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/30/2021 @2:30AM
Date: May 27, 2021AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 25, 2021SERVICE REQUEST FORM (EMAILED TO DP/AMH)
Date: May 24, 2021Citation-ISSUED ON SHARON CHANDLER-On 05/21/2021
Date: May 20, 2021SERVICE REQUEST FORM (EMLD TO DP)
Date: May 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/30/2021 @2:30PM
Date: May 24, 2021SHOW CAUSE-ISSUED ON SHARON CHANDLER. H/R 06/30/2021 - 02:30-On 05/24/2021
Date: May 24, 2021SERVICE RETURN
Date: May 27, 2021SHOW CAUSE Tr# 12 RET EXEC(SHARON CHANDLER) On 05/26/2021
Date: May 27, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIV
Date: May 20, 2021Citation Tr# 3 RET EXEC(SHARON CHANDLER) On 05/26/2021
Date: May 27, 2021JOINT MTN FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: June 25, 2021RULE 11 AGREEMENT/CL
Date: June 25, 2021MTN TO EQUAL ATNY'S FEES/MTN FOR INTRM ATNY FEES
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT MTN FOR CONTINUANCE | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT/CL | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) CPTNR'S NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORD | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER- SHARON CHANDLER | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTERPETITIONER'S NOT OF HRG FOR TEMP ORDS 6/30/21 @ 2:30PM | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #20 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 6/30/2021 @2:30AM | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.