Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/20/2017 Image ID 4491 Signed 08/31/2017
Date: August 31, 2017ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4509
Date: October 25, 2017T.R.O. PROTECTIVE ORDER Tr# 5 RET UNEXEC(WADE A BARROW) On 01/03/2017
Date: January 03, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 25, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: October 25, 2017CITATION, Prot Order Tr# 4 RET UNEXEC(WADE A BARROW) On 01/03/2017
Date: January 03, 2017AMENDED TEMP EX PARTE PROT ORDER/01-23-17@9AM
Date: January 03, 2017EXPARTE PROT ORDER HRG/1-3-17 @ 9:30AM
Date: December 30, 2016APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: December 30, 2016CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4509 | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER OF PRO/SE ORDER DISMISSAL | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER OF PRO/SE NOTICE DISMISSAL | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/20/2017 Image ID 4491 Signed 08/31/2017 | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | T.R.O. PROTECTIVE ORDER Tr# 5 RET UNEXEC(WADE A BARROW) On 01/03/2017 | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CITATION, Prot Order Tr# 4 RET UNEXEC(WADE A BARROW) On 01/03/2017 | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED TEMP EX PARTE PROT ORDER/01-23-17@9AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.