Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2014 |
CategoryModification-Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
COUNTERPETITION TO ADJUDICATE PARENTAGE
Date: May 13, 2014CITATION TR# 1 SCAN
Date: April 22, 2014ORDER SETTING HRG FOR TEMP ORDS/5-21-14 8:30AM
Date: April 24, 2014PETITION TO ADJUDICATE PARENTAGE
Date: April 22, 2014ORDER SETTING HRG FOR T.O./5-21-14 8:30AM
Date: May 14, 2014SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: April 22, 2014SHOW CAUSE-ISSUED ON COURTNEY AMBER HALDER
Date: April 24, 2014ORDER FOR DRUG TESTING/ALIA ALI & COURTNEY
Date: May 21, 2014MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: September 15, 2014Citation Tr# 1 RET EXEC(COURTNEY AMBER HALDER HUSS
Date: May 05, 2014RESP'S ORIG ANSW - COURTNEY AMBER HALDER-HUSSIEN
Date: May 13, 2014MOTION TO SIGN FINAL ORDER
Date: January 21, 2015NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 01/23/2015 Image ID
Date: November 20, 2014HAIDER OSH PETITION TO ADJUDICATE PARENTAGE 04
Date: April 24, 2014ASSOCIATE JUDGES REPORT
Date: May 21, 2014HAIDER CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET 04.22.14
Date: April 22, 2014ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: August 01, 2014HAIDER OSH PETITION TO ADJUDICATE PARENTAGE 04
Date: April 22, 2014ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD
Date: May 13, 2014ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: June 05, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING-7/25/14 @ 8:30AM
Date: July 15, 2014NOT OF HRG/MOT TO SIGN FINAL ORD/2-3-15 @ 9:00AM
Date: January 21, 2015DOCKET SHEET
Date: April 29, 2016SHOW CAUSE Tr# 14 RET EXEC(COURTNEY AMBER HALDER H
Date: May 05, 2014ORDERS: REC ON DISMISSAL
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER ADJUDICATING PARENTAGE
Date: February 03, 2015APPEARANCE - SHABBAB HAIDER
Date: April 26, 2016MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: November 05, 2014ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR C/S
Date: February 03, 2015SUBPOENA LAQUEENA WARREN/7-27-16 @ 9AM
Date: July 25, 2016PETITION TO MODIFY P/C RELATIONSHIP
Date: March 22, 2016ORDER OF DISMISSAL CC: ATTY MCGILL/HOLLAND-ALL
Date: April 29, 2016PETITION TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP
Date: July 14, 2016MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: June 25, 2014ORDER SETTING FINAL TRIAL/2-3-15 9AM
Date: January 22, 2015REQUEST FORM
Date: July 14, 2016PTNRS CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY DIRECTED TO RESP
Date: July 20, 2016RESPONDENTS ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2016Citation-ISSUED ON COURTNEY AMBER HALDER
Date: March 22, 2016ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT/RESET 10-4-16 @ 9:00AM
Date: July 27, 2016SUBPOENA KAREN BURKETT/7-27-16 @ 9AM
Date: July 25, 2016CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 19, 2016MOTION TO SIGN MODIFIED TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: December 15, 2016ORDER SETTING HRG/MOT TO SIGN/1-6-17 @ 10AM
Date: December 15, 2016MOTION TO AMEND STYLE OF CASE
Date: October 27, 2016ASSOCIATE JUDGES REPORT
Date: October 12, 2016TRO GRANTING EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF/7-27-16 @ 9AM
Date: July 15, 2016CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: February 03, 2015MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: October 10, 2016AGREED ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION
Date: October 12, 2016AUSTIN FORM
Date: February 03, 2015AMD MTN TO MODIFY & FOR FURTHER TEMP ORDS & FOR
Date: April 21, 2017HEALTH INSURANCE CARD INFORMATION
Date: March 05, 2015SHOW CAUSE Tr# 65 RET EXEC(COURTNEY AMBER HALDER H
Date: April 06, 2016RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: April 06, 2016SUBPOENA KAREN BURKETT/7-27-16 @ 9AM
Date: July 26, 2016CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: July 14, 2016Citation-ISSUED ON COURTNEY AMBER
Date: July 14, 2016NOTICE OF HRG/TEMP ORDERS/4-26-16 @ 9AM
Date: March 22, 2016T.R.O.-ISSUED ON COURTNEY AMBER HALDER-HUSSIEN.
Date: July 14, 2016NOT OF HRG/MOT FOR ADD'L TO/02-21-17@9AM
Date: February 08, 2017TRO/EXPARTE ORDER SETTING HEARING 5/1/17 9AM
Date: April 20, 2017(PROPOSED) ORDER AMENDING STYLE OF CASE
Date: October 27, 2016ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: May 01, 2017Citation Tr# 63 RET EXEC(COURTNEY AMBER HALDER HUS
Date: April 06, 2016MODIFIED TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: January 06, 2017CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 21, 2017CONFIRMATION LETTER RE:04-19-17@9AM (CL)
Date: March 31, 2017SUBPOENA LAQUEENA WARREN/7-27-16 @ 9AM
Date: July 26, 2016HEARING CONFIRMATION LETTER
Date: October 10, 2016ORD/W/HOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT CC: C/S
Date: October 03, 2017MOTION TO SIGN TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: October 10, 2016ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: January 06, 2017RESP MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TEMP ORD
Date: February 06, 2017ORDER RESETTING HRG/10-12-16 @ 10AM
Date: October 04, 2016WITNESS SUBPOENA - JOANN TATE
Date: June 14, 2017(ATTACHMENT)CONFIRMATION LTR BETWEEN ATTYS (CL)
Date: February 15, 2017ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: May 05, 2017ORDER FOR COMMUNITY SUPERVISED VISITATION
Date: May 31, 2017ORDER FOR CUSTODY EVALUATION
Date: October 12, 2016WITNESS SUBPOENA - CYNTHIA NASH
Date: June 14, 2017ORDER FOR SUPERVISED VISITATION AT THE VISITATION
Date: May 01, 2017TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY PCR
Date: October 12, 2016SUBPOENA - KAREN BURKETT
Date: August 11, 2017PRE-TRIAL CONTROL SCHEDULING ORDER FOR NON JURY
Date: October 12, 2016WITNESS SUBPOENA - CLARISA JOHNSON
Date: June 14, 2017AGREED ORDER AMENDED STYLE OF CASE
Date: November 10, 2016ORDER ON MOT FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: September 23, 2014MOTION TO SIGN FINAL ORDER
Date: October 31, 2017MOTION TO MODIFY AND FOR FURTHER TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: February 15, 2017RENDITION OF THE COURT
Date: August 29, 2017RESP'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TEMP ORDERS
Date: May 19, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: April 29, 2016(PROPOSED) INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT
Date: October 02, 2017TEMPORARY ORDER RENDERED AFTER TRO GRANTING
Date: May 31, 2017WITNESS SUBPOENA - GINGER GOSSETT
Date: August 17, 2017SUBPEONA - LAQUEENA WARREN
Date: August 11, 2017NOT OF HRG/ADD'L TEMP ORDERS/05-31-17@9AM
Date: May 19, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: February 03, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING 10/17 @ 9AM - COUNTERPETITIONERS
Date: September 25, 2018CO PARENTING ESSENTIALS - SHABBAB HAIDER
Date: October 18, 2017RESP'S MOT FOR MODIFICATION OF DISCOVERY CONTROL
Date: August 21, 2017Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 0
Date: February 03, 2015NOTICE OF FILING-THE PARENTING CENTER CERTIFICATE
Date: November 15, 2017TEMP ORD REGARDING CHILD'S PASSPORT PROVISIONS
Date: October 22, 2018MOTION TO SIGN TEMP ORD(S)
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING -11/3/20 @ 9:15AM
Date: September 21, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 06, 2017PARENTING CERTIFICATE - KIDS FIRST
Date: November 06, 2017SERVICE RETURN
Date: July 11, 2018PETITION TO MOD PCR
Date: July 09, 2018ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUB COUNSEL-M FREEMAN
Date: September 14, 2020MOTION FOR SUB COUNSEL-M FREEMAN
Date: September 11, 2020ORDER ON MOTION SUB COUNSEL (PROPOSED)
Date: September 11, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: November 09, 2017PRE-TRIAL CONTROL SCHEDULING ORD - 12/1/21 @9:30AM
Date: November 03, 2020BLUE CARD
Date: May 01, 20191ST AMENDED PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: April 29, 2020TEMPORARY AJ'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Date: October 31, 2018TEMPORARY ORDER(S)
Date: April 23, 2019ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: October 17, 2018Citation-ISSUED ON SHABBAB HAIDER-On 07/10/2018
Date: July 09, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 4/23/19 @ 9AM - MTN SIGN TEMP
Date: April 11, 2019RESP'S 1ST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: March 30, 20212ND AMD PET TO MODIFY PCR
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 04/26/2019 Image ID 480
Date: February 26, 2019DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 01, 2019SUBP/RTN - JESSICA HODGES PENTECOST
Date: April 05, 2022VACATION LETTER FROM ATTY REED/CL
Date: February 03, 2020COURT SERVICES ORDER
Date: October 17, 2018RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER-S. HAIDER
Date: July 24, 2018AMENDED IWO CC: C/S
Date: November 09, 2017ORDER IN SMPCR CC:BOTH ATTY'S
Date: November 09, 2017Citation Tr# 176 RET EXEC(SHABBAB HAIDER) On 07/10
Date: July 11, 2018COUNTERPETITIONER'S MOTION TO RELEASE CHILD'S PASS
Date: September 26, 2018ORD FOR PARENTING COORDINATION THRU FAM COURT SVCS
Date: October 31, 2018BLUE CARD
Date: November 09, 2017ATTY VACATION NOTICE - ATTY MARTH AKERS
Date: July 02, 2021CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION- SHABBAB HAIDER
Date: January 25, 2021MOTION FOR JUDGE TO CONFER WITH CHILD
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF HRG FOR TEMP ORD 10/17/18 9AM
Date: September 11, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 4/23/19 @ 9AM - PT CONF
Date: April 11, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: March 21, 2019RESP'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR FINAL TRIAL
Date: April 13, 2022PRE-TRIAL DKT CTRL SCHED ORD NON-JURY DKT/
Date: April 23, 2019ORD ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: November 30, 2021CONFIRMATION LTR 12/1/21 @ 9:30AM/CL
Date: October 26, 2021RESP'S MOTION TO CLARIFY
Date: May 10, 2022(PROPOSED) ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: November 29, 2021RESP'S WITNESS LIST
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT RECEIPT
Date: April 25, 2022JUDGE'S RULING
Date: May 04, 2022CONFIRMATION LTR RE: RESET HRG 4/14/2022 @1:30PM
Date: January 18, 2022VACATION LETTER FROM ATTY MARTHA AKERS FREEMAN/CL
Date: March 25, 2022RESP'S REQUEST FOR RELIEF
Date: April 13, 2022SUBP/RTN - HEB INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Date: March 30, 2022VAC LTR - MARTHA AKERS FREEMAN/CL
Date: July 13, 2022RESP'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 13, 2022(PROPOSED) NOTICE OF HRG
Date: May 11, 2022ORD IN SUIT TO MOD PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP
Date: July 15, 2022SHABBAB HAIDER'S MTN FOR RELEASE OF CHILD'S
Date: May 11, 2022(PROPOSED) NOTICE OF HRG
Date: May 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/16/22 @9:00 AM
Date: May 11, 2022ORD GRANTING SHABBAB HAIDER'S MTN FOR RELEASE OF
Date: May 16, 2022LTR FROM JUDGE TO ATTY ROBBINS RE: REGISTRY MONEY
Date: June 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORD IN SUIT TO MOD PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | VAC LTR - MARTHA AKERS FREEMAN/CL | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | LTR FROM JUDGE TO ATTY ROBBINS RE: REGISTRY MONEY | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Registry notification from #239 | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORD GRANTING SHABBAB HAIDER'S MTN FOR RELEASE OF | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | RESP'S EXHIBIT LIST | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) NOTICE OF HRG | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | SHABBAB HAIDER'S MTN FOR RELEASE OF CHILD'S | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/16/22 @9:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.