Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Cherami J. Blaney Jenkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2011 |
CategoryPost Judgment Title Iv-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o
Date: October 04, 2019IV-D Citation Tr# 113 RET EXEC(FRANK KECKEISSEN) O
Date: February 25, 2020IV-D CITATION RETURN - FK
Date: February 25, 2020Costbill (Collections) for $38 FRANK KECKEISSEN
Date: September 03, 2019MOT FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: July 18, 2011ORIG PET IN SAPCR
Date: June 27, 2011INTERVENTION\INTERPLEADER, FAMILY
Date: November 29, 2011MOT TO MOD TEMP ORDERS NOTICE OF HRG/10-24-11
Date: October 17, 2011SHOW CAUSE-ISSUED ON URSULA MARSHALL. H/R
Date: July 13, 2011ORDER FOR COURT SERVICES(CC:JILL ECLAIR)
Date: July 27, 2011APPEARANCE -U MARSHALL
Date: July 20, 2011ORDER FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: October 24, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING FOR TEMP ORDERS/7-20-11 8:30AM
Date: June 27, 2011ORDER ON MOT TO W/D COUNSEL/ATTY JORDAN
Date: September 28, 2011RET'D MAIL/FRANK KECKEISSEN/NO SUCH STREET
Date: August 05, 2011Citation-ISSUED ON URSULA MARSHALL-On 07/13/2011
Date: July 13, 2011PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: October 24, 2011MOTION TO MODIFY TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: October 17, 2011ORD FOR SUPERVISED VIST AT THE VISITATION CTR
Date: July 27, 2011ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACH'T(CC:
Date: July 27, 2011MOT TO TRANSFER
Date: July 27, 2011ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR
Date: October 24, 2011TEMPORARY ORDER IN SAPCR
Date: October 24, 2011MOTION TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL(ATTY JORDAN)
Date: September 28, 2011AJ REPORT ON EMERGENCY T.O.
Date: November 30, 2011USPS TRACK AND CONFIRM
Date: October 25, 2011TEMP ORD(S) IN SAPCR
Date: November 15, 2011A/J'S REPORT
Date: July 27, 2011ORDER FOR DRUG TESTING
Date: May 24, 2012MOT ENFORCE POSSESS/ACCESS
Date: October 24, 2011APPEARANCE-FDC-URSULA MARSHALL
Date: September 28, 2011A/J REC FOR EMERGENCY TO -RESET 7/27/11 @ 8:30
Date: July 20, 2011ACCUTRACE TEST REQUEST FORM
Date: July 27, 2011IV-D CITATION RETURN (AW)
Date: December 04, 2018TEMP ORDERS IN SAPCR CC: NO COPIES
Date: November 30, 2011ASSOCIATE JUDGES REPORT
Date: September 27, 2012APPEARANCE-FDC-URSULA MARSHALL
Date: November 30, 2011A/J SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT -HABEAS 11/8/11 @ 8:30
Date: October 25, 2011APPEARANCE-FDC-URSULA MARSHALL
Date: September 27, 2012APPEARANCE OF U MARSHALL ON 10/24/11
Date: October 25, 2011AJ SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT
Date: November 08, 2011A/J SUPPL'MNTL REPORT -ATTACHMENT 11/8/11 @ 8:30
Date: October 25, 2011PAUPERS AFFIDAVIT OF INABILITY TO PAY COSTS
Date: October 24, 2011ORDER FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: November 15, 2011APPLICATION OR MOT FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
Date: November 15, 2011APPEARANCE OF U MARSHALL ON 10/25/11
Date: October 25, 2011MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TEMPORARY ORDERS/HRG-3/18/13
Date: March 06, 2013APPEARANCE (URSULA MARSHALL)
Date: May 25, 2012APPOINTMENT OF AN AMICUS ATTY (CHERAMI JENKINS)
Date: May 24, 2012APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL/SCOTT JORDAN
Date: May 30, 2012RET'D MAIL/FRANK KECKEISSEN/NO SUCH STREET
Date: May 02, 2012AMICUS ATTY'S ORIG ANSW IN SAPCR
Date: May 30, 2012ORDER FOR SOCIAL STUDY
Date: April 24, 2012RET'D MAIL/URSULA MARSHALL/UNABLE TO FORWARD
Date: June 04, 2012TEMP ORD(S) PURSUANT TO HRG OF 05/24/12
Date: November 07, 2012ADDT'L TEMP ORDERS IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PCR
Date: April 15, 2013MOT FOR ENFORCEMENT OF C/S ORDER/5-2-13 8:30AM
Date: March 18, 2013APPEARANCE-FDC-URSULA MARSHALL
Date: May 30, 2013APPT OF COUNSEL/SETTING TRIAL/6-27-13 1:30PM
Date: May 30, 2013CONFIRM LTR RE: 10-24-13 10AM FINAL HRG
Date: August 13, 2013TEMP ORD(S) PURSUANT TO HRG OF 9/27/12
Date: November 06, 2012MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE 8-15-13/8:30AM
Date: August 02, 2013MOTION TO W/D COUNSEL-S D JORDAN (8-12-13/8:30)
Date: July 19, 2013APPEARANCE-FDC-ANN WEDGEWOOD
Date: May 30, 2013ASSOC JUDGES RECOMMENDATION FOR ADDT'L TEMP ORDS
Date: March 18, 2013ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE/HRG-
Date: July 16, 2013AJ REC FOR RESET & ADDT'L TO/8-22-12 @ 1:30PM
Date: July 12, 2012AGREED ORDER REFERRING FINAL TRIAL TO ASSOCIATE
Date: March 18, 2013AJ'S REPORT (RESET 7/11/2012 1:30PM)
Date: May 24, 2012APPEARANCE - URSULA MARSHALL
Date: October 24, 2013MOTION TO MODIFY TEMP ORDERS/9-27-12 8:30AM
Date: September 13, 2012IV-D TARRANT COUNTY SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: October 30, 2018IV-D Citation Tr# 114 RET EXEC(ANN WEDGEWOOD) On 1
Date: December 04, 2018IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON ANN WEDGEWOOD-On
Date: October 30, 2018ANSW TO MOTION FOR ENFORCE'T OF C/S ORDER
Date: June 10, 2013ASSOC JDG'S RECOMMENDATION FOR CONTEMPT
Date: May 02, 2013ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD
Date: December 11, 2013LTR FROM ATTY DEEK TO JDG WELLS/RE: VERBAL
Date: August 22, 2012ASSOC JDG'S REPORT ON ENFORCE
Date: May 02, 2013CONFIRM LTR RE: FINAL TRIAL 10-24-13 10AM
Date: August 14, 2013WAIVER OF SERVICE/URSULA MARSHALL
Date: May 23, 2013RENDITION
Date: October 28, 2013WAIVER OF SERVICE/FRANK KECKEISSEN
Date: March 20, 2013CONFIRM LTR RE: RESET HRG 5-30-13 8:30AM
Date: May 17, 2013ORDER HOLDING RESP IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE
Date: October 24, 2013Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 1
Date: December 11, 2013CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: December 11, 2013APPEARANCE - FRANK KECKEISSEN
Date: July 16, 2019IV-D MOTION FOR ENF & SUIT FOR MOD OF SUPPORT ORD
Date: October 30, 2018ORDER ON APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND SETTING CAUSE
Date: March 28, 2019APPEARANCE - FRANK KECKEISSEN
Date: April 01, 2019ORDER TO APPEAR & SHOW CAUSE - 3/28/19 @ 8:15AM-FK
Date: January 30, 2019CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: October 30, 2018PAY VOUCHER/ATTY SAMANTHA JUNKER/$1000
Date: January 21, 2014DOCKET SHEET
Date: December 11, 2013APPEARANCE - ANN WEDGEWOOD
Date: April 01, 2019APPEARANCE - ANN WEDWOOD
Date: October 24, 2013IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON FRANK KECKEISSEN-On
Date: October 30, 2018APPEARANCE - ANN WEDGEWOOD
Date: April 25, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (PROPOSED) NOTICE OF HRG
Date: May 24, 2019APPEARANCE - FRANK KECKEISSEN
Date: April 25, 2019AJ'S ORDER - RESET 7/16/19 @ 8:15AM CRT #3
Date: April 25, 2019ORDER ENFORCING AND MODIFYING SUPPORT OBLIGATION
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 0
Date: July 18, 2019INCORRECT COSTBILL (AG ONLY) FOR $247 FRANK KECKEI
Date: July 18, 2019APPEARANCE - ANN WEDGEWOOD
Date: July 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation Tr# 113 RET EXEC(FRANK KECKEISSEN) O | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | IV-D CITATION RETURN - FK | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AG Credit;transaction# 142 dated 11/06/2019 | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED-FANK KECKEISSEN | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $38 FRANK KECKEISSEN | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 0 | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | INCORRECT COSTBILL (AG ONLY) FOR $247 FRANK KECKEI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.