Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent Child Relationship Iv-D |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
******C/C ORDER REDUCING C/S OBLIG TO JUDG-*******
Date: December 30, 2005******C/C ORD REDUCING UNPAID C/S OBLIG JUDGE*****
Date: December 30, 2005******C/C ORD TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE************
Date: December 30, 2005************C/C RESER ORDER***********************
Date: December 30, 2005******C/C ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE**********
Date: December 30, 2005*******C/C ORDER REGARDING CASH BOND**************
Date: December 30, 2005*********C/C ORDER TO TRANSFER********************
Date: December 30, 2005***C/C EMPLOYERS ORD TO WITHHOLD EAR FOR C/S******
Date: December 30, 2005******C/C MOTION FOR ENFORCE OF C/S ORD***********
Date: December 30, 2005Check in/out index card and Docket sheet
Date: February 14, 2006*********C/C ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF CAPIAS*********
Date: December 30, 2005NOTICE AND APPROVAL OF NONSUIT
Date: February 14, 2006NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT
Date: March 21, 2006************TRANSFER LETTER***********************
Date: December 30, 2005************C/C CIVIL DOCKET SHEET****************
Date: December 30, 2005**********C/C RESET ORDER*************************
Date: December 30, 2005*******C/C ORDER ESTABLISHING THE P-CR************
Date: December 30, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 1, dated 12/30/2005 | |
March 21, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Check in/out index card and Docket sheet | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND APPROVAL OF NONSUIT | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | ******C/C ORDER REDUCING C/S OBLIG TO JUDG-******* | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | ******C/C ORD REDUCING UNPAID C/S OBLIG JUDGE***** | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | ******C/C ORD TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE************ | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | ************C/C RESER ORDER*********************** | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | ******C/C ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE********** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.