Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPaternity Iv-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Citation-ISSUED ON EDWARD DURAN THOMAS-On
Date: December 30, 2005Subpoena W/SVC-ISSUED ON ALLANITA CHIQUTA HARRIS-O
Date: September 18, 2006APPLICATION-SUBP-ALLANITA C HARRIS (1-8-07/8:30)
Date: September 19, 2006N/SUIT(PTN TO ESTABLISH THE PCR FILED 12-30-05)
Date: January 09, 2007CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET
Date: January 09, 2007NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 01/19/2007 Image ID
Date: November 30, 2006FILING, PATERNITY OR VOLUNTARY PATERNITY SUIT
Date: December 30, 2005ORDER FOR PARENTAGE TESTING
Date: April 19, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event | ***FILE SENT TO RECORDS *** | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | N/SUIT(PTN TO ESTABLISH THE PCR FILED 12-30-05) | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET | |
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
December 01, 2006 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 6, dated 09/18/2006 | |
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 01/19/2007 Image ID | |
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Adjustment for service fee from # 6 | |
September 19, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION-SUBP-ALLANITA C HARRIS (1-8-07/8:30) | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Subpoena W/SVC-ISSUED ON ALLANITA CHIQUTA HARRIS-O | |
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARENTAGE TESTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.