Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Reciprocal Iv-D case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryReciprocal Iv-D |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON MELVIN JONES-On
Date: December 30, 2005FILING, INCOMING URESA
Date: December 30, 2005Check in/out index card and Docket sheet
Date: April 11, 2006CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET
Date: July 18, 2006ORD UNDER UIFSA/CC CS NCP CP
Date: July 18, 2006ORDER FOR PARENTAGE TESTING
Date: April 11, 2006RESP'S ORIG ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2006NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S
Date: August 20, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Adjustment for # 3 Waiting for Document Production | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Adjustment for # 12 | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | AIW ADJUSTMENT FOR TRANS # 12 | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | ***FILE SENT TO RECORDS *** | |
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET | |
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD UNDER UIFSA/CC CS NCP CP | |
July 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Check in/out index card and Docket sheet | |
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PARENTAGE TESTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.