Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
FAX FROM JUDGE POULOS
Date: February 16, 2018NOTICE OF HRG ON MOTION JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 02, 2019AJ REPORT
Date: February 16, 2018RTN EXECUTED SUBPOENA ISSUED BY ATTY JACOB
Date: March 08, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PCR
Date: December 29, 2017ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2018Citation-ISSUED ON JAY DANIEL DE LEON-On 01/03/2018
Date: December 29, 2017Citation Tr# 4 RET EXEC(JAY DANIEL DE LEON) On 01/10/2018
Date: January 24, 2018NOTICE OF HRG ON REQ FOR DE NOVO - 3/9/18 @ 9AM
Date: February 27, 2018INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC: C/S)
Date: May 31, 2019BLUE CARD
Date: May 24, 2019REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HRG - PP
Date: February 21, 2018MOTION FOR TEMP ORDERS & REQUEST FOR TRO
Date: February 06, 2018ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION IN SAPCR
Date: February 05, 2018(PROPOSED) NOH/DE NOVO - PP
Date: February 23, 2018CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 29, 2017MOTION FOR JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2019TRO/ORDER SETTING HRG TEMP ORDERS-2/15/18 @9AM
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING JUDGMENT - 5/31/19 @9
Date: May 10, 2019DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 24, 2019Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 05/31/2019
Date: May 31, 2019AUSTIN FORM
Date: May 31, 2019FINAL ORDER IN SAPCR (ATTY PTNR)
Date: May 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event | PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC: C/S) | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 05/31/2019 | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | AUSTIN FORM | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER IN SAPCR (ATTY PTNR) | |
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING JUDGMENT - 5/31/19 @9 | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HRG ON MOTION JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.