Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryEstablishment Iv-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Costbill (AG Only) for $293 KELVIN DON SANDERS
Date: October 01, 2018APPEARANCE - EBONI TRANETTE WILLIAMS
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 10/01/2018
Date: October 01, 2018TEMPORARY CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW ORDER (ESTABLISHINGTHE PCR) 9/25/18 @ 8:15AM
Date: January 23, 2018IV-D PETN FOR CONFIRMATION OF NONAGRD CSRO-HRG 1/23/18 8:15AM
Date: December 29, 2017Collections 60 Day Notice-Created on 02/27/2019
Date: February 27, 2019DOCKET SHEET
Date: September 25, 2018FINDINGS ON PETITION TO CONFIRM (AFTER HEARING)
Date: January 23, 2018Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created on 08/27/2019
Date: August 27, 2019DNA TEST REPORT
Date: January 30, 2018FINDINGS ON PETITION TO CONFIRM(AFTER HEARING)(CSRO - ESTABLISHING THE PCR) cc to ncp,cp on 10/1/18
Date: September 25, 2018RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: January 02, 2018APPEARANCE - EBONI TRANETTE WILLIAMS
Date: January 26, 2018BLUE CARD
Date: September 25, 2018Costbill (Collections) for $293 KELVIN DON SANDERS
Date: November 01, 2018CHILD SUPPORT REVIEW PROCESS STATEMENT OF RIGHTS
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created on 08/27/2019 | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Collections 60 Day Notice-Created on 02/27/2019 | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $293 KELVIN DON SANDERS | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Costbill (AG Only) for $293 KELVIN DON SANDERS | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 10/01/2018 | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE - EBONI TRANETTE WILLIAMS | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | FINDINGS ON PETITION TO CONFIRM(AFTER HEARING)(CSRO - ESTABLISHING THE PCR) cc to ncp,cp on 10/1/18 | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.