Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Christopher R. Wolfe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryPaternity Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
BLUE CARD
Date: July 24, 2018IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: July 24, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: July 24, 2018ASSOC. JUDGE'S ORDER (HRG ON 07/18/2018 @ 8:30AM)
Date: April 06, 2018IV-D RETURN OF SERVICE (DSM)
Date: February 20, 2018IV-D Citation Tr# 4 RET EXEC(DONNA SHANTALE MACK) On 02/15/2018
Date: February 20, 2018IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON CHRISTOPHER LATREAL JACKSON-On 01/10/2018
Date: December 29, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON DONNA SHANTALE MACK-On 01/10/2018
Date: December 29, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON WAYLON DEMMERY MACK-On 01/10/2018
Date: December 29, 2017IV-D SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: December 29, 2017CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 29, 2017IV-D PETN TO ESTABLISH PCR
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT ON 7/24/2018 CLOSES CASE | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSOC. JUDGE'S ORDER (HRG ON 07/18/2018 @ 8:30AM) | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D RETURN OF SERVICE (DSM) | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation Tr# 4 RET EXEC(DONNA SHANTALE MACK) On 02/15/2018 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 5, dated 12/29/2017 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 4, dated 12/29/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.