Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property, Other Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
GREGORY JORDAN'S ORIG PET
Date: June 17, 2021***ORD (PLTF'S MTN FOR SUB OF COUNSEL)
Date: September 30, 2021MTN FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: September 29, 2021(PROPOSED) ORDER
Date: September 29, 2021DEFN D.M.JR'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION & ALTERNATI
Date: August 12, 2021CIT Tr# 3 RET EXEC(NOEL DAVID MARTIN) On 07/21/202
Date: July 26, 2021CIT RETURN - NOEL DAVID MARTIN, JR
Date: July 26, 2021CIT REQUEST (DOC PROD)
Date: June 22, 2021CIT-ISSUED ON NOEL DAVID MARTIN, JR-On 06/23/2021
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ***ORD (PLTF'S MTN FOR SUB OF COUNSEL) | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MTN FOR SUB OF COUNSEL | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) ORDER | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFN D.M.JR'S PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION & ALTERNATI | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CIT Tr# 3 RET EXEC(NOEL DAVID MARTIN) On 07/21/202 | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CIT RETURN - NOEL DAVID MARTIN, JR | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CIT REQUEST (DOC PROD) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | GREGORY JORDAN'S ORIG PET | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIT-ISSUED ON NOEL DAVID MARTIN, JR-On 06/23/2021 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.