Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: February 17, 2017RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER-C ROLLO
Date: March 13, 2017MEDIATED SETTLEMENT-DIV W/CHILDREN
Date: June 26, 2017QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORD/CITI RET SAVINGS
Date: October 19, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: February 17, 2017AGREED MUTUAL INJUNCTIONS
Date: March 08, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/25/2017 ID #4489Signed 08/29/2017
Date: August 29, 2017ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR C/S (CC:C/S)
Date: October 19, 2017DOMESTIC RELAT ORD DIVID RETIREMENT PLAN BENEFITS
Date: October 19, 2017DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER
Date: October 19, 2017AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC:RESP ATTY)
Date: October 19, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: October 19, 2017AUSTIN FORM
Date: October 19, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORD/CITI RET SAVINGS | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR C/S (CC:C/S) | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC RELAT ORD DIVID RETIREMENT PLAN BENEFITS | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC:RESP ATTY) | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | AUSTIN FORM | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 10/25/2017 ID #4489Signed 08/29/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.