Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryModification-Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
DOCKET SHEET
Date: September 20, 2013EMPLR ORD W/H ERNGS FOR C/S (CC: ATTY CASEY,C/S)
Date: March 06, 2013WAIVER OF SERVICE - JOB GONZALEZ
Date: January 23, 2013ORDER (TO DISM)
Date: September 20, 2013PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: August 26, 2013Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 0
Date: March 06, 2013FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC:ALL ATTY CASEY)
Date: March 06, 2013CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: March 06, 2013ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE & REQUEST FOR TEMP
Date: December 31, 2012CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: September 20, 2013DOCKET SHEET
Date: March 06, 2013INFORMATION SHEET
Date: December 31, 2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 10, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER (TO DISM) | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION TO MODIFY PCR | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #12 | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | EMPLR ORD W/H ERNGS FOR C/S (CC: ATTY CASEY,C/S) | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 0 | |
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE (CC:ALL ATTY CASEY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.