Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPaternity Iv-D |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
HEALTH INSURANCE AVAILABIITY FORM
Date: November 09, 2006NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S
Date: April 15, 2008Costbill (Collections) for $250 JAMES A GARRETT
Date: February 07, 2013IV-D NOT OF TERM OF ASSIGN. AND CHILD SUPPORT SVCS
Date: December 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: November 09, 2006CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET
Date: November 06, 2006RETURNED ENVELOPE - JAMES A GARRETT
Date: March 12, 2013NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S
Date: January 23, 2008NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S
Date: May 07, 2009NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S
Date: December 06, 2006DEFAULT ORDER ESTB P/C RELATIONSHIP (CC:NCP,CP,CC)
Date: November 06, 2006Citation-ISSUED ON JAMES A GARRETT-On 08/02/2006
Date: July 31, 2006Citation-ISSUED ON JAMES A GARRETT-On 01/04/2006
Date: December 30, 2005Citation-ISSUED ON JAMES A GARRETT-On 03/01/2006
Date: February 28, 2006APPEARANCE FDC SH SH
Date: April 18, 2006FILING, PATERNITY OR VOLUNTARY PATERNITY SUIT
Date: December 30, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOT OF TERM OF ASSIGN. AND CHILD SUPPORT SVCS | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | RETURNED ENVELOPE - JAMES A GARRETT | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $250 JAMES A GARRETT | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | AIW ADJUSTMENT FOR TRANS # 15 | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | AIW ADJUSTMENT FOR TRANS # 17 | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | AIW ADJUSTMENT FOR TRANS # 19 | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 21, dated 05/07/2009 | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADM WRIT/ORDER TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S | |
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 19, dated 04/15/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.