Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Reciprocal case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryReciprocal |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
PAY VOUCHER/FAYE HARDEN/$300.00 (CC: AUDITOR)
Date: June 24, 2010RELEASE ORDER (K NELSON JR) 09-28-11 @8:30AM
Date: May 04, 2011ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 3553
Date: June 27, 2012APPEARANCE (KENNETH NELSON)
Date: October 03, 2011ORDER OF COMMITMENT
Date: September 28, 2011ANSWER TO MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF CHILD
Date: June 16, 2010ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE 4/14/10 8:30AM
Date: January 25, 2010MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT (UIFSA)
Date: October 29, 2007FILING, INCOMING URESA
Date: December 30, 2005Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o
Date: February 20, 2013IV-D NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT AND CSS
Date: December 19, 2018Costbill (Collections) for $282 KENNETH RAY NELSON
Date: July 30, 2012CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD
Date: June 27, 2012DOCKET SHEET
Date: June 27, 2012NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 06/27/2012 Image ID
Date: April 30, 2012Capias/Imprisonment-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON,
Date: October 18, 2010COMMITMENT ORDER CC: SHERIFFS
Date: October 13, 2010SHERIFF'S STATUS RESPONSE-CAPIAS IMPRISONMENT-
Date: April 12, 2011PAY VOUCHER (FAYE HARDEN $150)CC:AUDITOR
Date: May 02, 2011Costbill (AG Cases Only) for $502
Date: June 24, 2010TEMPORARY ORDER ENFORCING SUPPORT OBLIGATION
Date: June 24, 2010NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 06/25/2008 Image ID
Date: April 29, 2008MOTION TO ENFORCE DECREE OR ORDER, FAMILY
Date: August 24, 2009Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON,
Date: October 29, 2007Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON,
Date: August 24, 2009ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Date: March 29, 2006SHOW CAUSE W/SVC-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON,
Date: August 24, 2009ORD TO APPEAR & SHOW CAUSE 10-28-09 830
Date: September 16, 2009APPEARANCE - KENNETH NELSON
Date: April 14, 2010ORD/APPNT COUNSEL SET TRIAL (TRIAL 6-16-10/8:30)
Date: April 14, 2010DEFAULT ORDER UNDER UNIFORM INTERSTATE FAMILY
Date: March 29, 2006CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD AND DOCKET SHEET
Date: June 06, 2008NOTICE OF NONSUIT/NONSUIT
Date: June 06, 2008Check in/out index card and Docket sheet
Date: April 06, 2006Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON-On
Date: December 30, 2005SHOW CAUSE-ISSUED ON KENNETH RAY NELSON, JR. H/R
Date: January 26, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF ASSIGNMENT AND CSS | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created o | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $282 KENNETH RAY NELSON | |
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 3553 | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | CHECK IN/OUT INDEX CARD | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 06/27/2012 Image ID | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE (KENNETH NELSON) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.