Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment Family Law |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (04/12/22 @ 9A)
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - 5/2/22 @ 9 AM
Date: April 14, 2022ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL - ATTY SKIPPER
Date: January 18, 2022MOTION FOR WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL
Date: January 10, 2022TREILON PARKMON'S REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HEARING
Date: November 08, 2021ORIGINAL PET IN SAPCR/SEEKING MODIFICATION OF AN -
Date: August 03, 2021REQUEST TO REGISTER AN ORD UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD
Date: July 02, 2021VACATION LETTER
Date: April 22, 2022(PROPOSED) TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY PCR
Date: February 09, 2022AJ'S REPORT
Date: November 05, 2021ORIGINAL COUNTERPET TO MOD PCR
Date: October 28, 2021(PROP) ORD ON MOT TO ABATE TEMP ORDERS HEARING &
Date: August 18, 2021(PROP) ORDER ON MOTION FOR W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: January 10, 2022MOT TO ABATE TEMP ORDS HRG & REQUEST FOR REFERRAL
Date: August 18, 2021NTC OF HRG (11/4/21 @130P)
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (8/20/21 @ 9AM)
Date: August 19, 2021MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION
Date: August 20, 2021RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: October 15, 2021ORD RESETTING HRG|11/4/21 @ 1:30PM|PTNR'S TEMP ORD
Date: August 20, 2021TEMPORARY MUTUAL INJUNCTION
Date: August 20, 2021Notice, Reg Child Custody, Cert Mail-ISSUED ON-On
Date: July 02, 2021TRO CIT RETURN TR # 17
Date: August 16, 2021Citation Tr# 15 RET EXEC(LESIDIA MICHELLE PARKMON)
Date: August 17, 2021RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: August 18, 2021TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD|8/20/21 @ 9AM
Date: August 04, 2021T.R.O. Tr# 17 RET EXEC(LESIDIA MICHELLE PARKMON) O
Date: August 16, 2021CITATION RETURN TR # 15
Date: August 17, 2021Citation-ISSUED ON LESIDIA MICHELLE PARKMON-On
Date: August 03, 2021T.R.O.-ISSUED ON LESIDIA MICHELLE PARKMON. H/R
Date: August 03, 2021Notice, Reg Child Custody, Cert Mail Tr# 11 RET UN
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - 5/2/22 @ 9 AM | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (04/12/22 @ 9A) | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY PCR | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL - ATTY SKIPPER | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | (PROP) ORDER ON MOTION FOR W/D OF COUNSEL | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | TREILON PARKMON'S REQUEST FOR DE NOVO HEARING | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AJ'S REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.