Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
RESP CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: November 11, 2019APPL FOR SUBPOENA
Date: February 04, 2020NTC OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY ATTY PARMER ON MIKE MARTINEZ
Date: December 30, 2019PTNR'S MOTION LEAVE TO SELL SEPARATE REAL PROPERTY
Date: October 04, 2019REQ FOR SUBPOENA TO BE EMAILED
Date: February 04, 2020Subpoena-ISSUED ON CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ATTN: 12070-7000(SUBPOENA DEPT)-On 02/11/2020
Date: February 04, 2020RESP CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 30, 2019NTC OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION
Date: November 05, 2019PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: October 11, 2019PTNR NTC OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION TO JBJ
Date: November 05, 2019LETTER FILING MOT FOR LEAVE
Date: October 04, 2019RESPONDENT'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: October 14, 2019NOT OF HRG PTNR'S MTN SELL PROP- 10/28/19 @9AM
Date: October 17, 2019NOTICE OF FINAL TRIAL-11/16/20 @ 9:30AM
Date: September 24, 2019MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: August 26, 2019NOT OF HRG 9/24/19 8:30A RESP'S MOT FOR PT CONF
Date: August 27, 2019ORD GRANTING PTNR'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WD/SUB OFCOUNSEL
Date: July 26, 2019LETTER INREGARDS TO MOTION FOR W/D & SUB COUNSEL
Date: July 25, 2019(PROPOSED)ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED W/D & SUB ATTY
Date: July 25, 2019UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR W/D & SUB COUNSEL
Date: July 25, 2019CONFIRMATION LETTER 7/16/19 8:30A
Date: July 12, 2019ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: July 02, 2019WRIT TEMP INJ Tr# 28 RET UNEXEC(JEANIE BETH JONES) On 06/21/2019
Date: June 21, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING-7/16/19 @ 8:30AM
Date: June 20, 2019(PROPOSED) NOT OF HRG
Date: June 20, 2019PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: June 11, 2019ORDER ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION
Date: June 05, 2019CERT MAIL RECEIPT 7015 1520 0003 4752 9018
Date: June 05, 2019PTNR'S MTN TO COMPEL MEDIATION
Date: June 04, 2019(PROPOSED) ORD ON PTNR'S MTN TO COMPEL MEDIATION
Date: June 04, 2019RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2019WRIT TEMP INJ-ISSUED ON JEANIE BETH JONES-On 05/20/2019
Date: May 20, 2019SERVICE REQUEST FORM
Date: April 24, 2019TEMPORARY ORDER(S) AND TEMP INJUNCTION
Date: April 24, 2019T.R.O. Tr# 10 RET EXEC(JEANIE BETH JONES) On 04/18/2019
Date: April 22, 2019Citation Tr# 3 RET EXEC(JEANIE BETH JONES) On 04/18/2019
Date: April 22, 2019RETURN SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2019ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 18, 2019(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING MTN FOR SUB SVC PROCESS
Date: April 18, 2019MTN FOR SUB SVC OF PROCESS
Date: April 18, 2019TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD-4/24/19 @8:30AM
Date: April 12, 2019T.R.O.-ISSUED ON JEANIE BETH JONES. H/R 04/24/2019 - 08:30-On 04/12/2019
Date: April 12, 2019MOTION & APP FOR TRO, TEMP INJUNCTION & TEMP ORDER
Date: April 11, 2019(PROPOSED)TRO & ORDER SETTING HRG FOR TEMP ORDER
Date: April 11, 2019PETITIONER'S MOTION & APPLICATION FOR TRO, TEMP INJUNCTIONS, & TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: April 11, 2019Citation-ISSUED ON JEANIE BETH JONES-On 04/08/2019
Date: March 21, 2019SERVICE REQUEST FORM (E-MAILED DOCPROD)
Date: April 08, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REPORTER'S CERT OF DEPOSITION | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | APPL FOR SUBPOENA | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQ FOR SUBPOENA TO BE EMAILED | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena-ISSUED ON CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ATTN: 12070-7000(SUBPOENA DEPT)-On 02/11/2020 | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #58 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY ATTY PARMER ON MIKE MARTINEZ | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RESP CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event | RESP CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NTC OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PTNR NTC OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL DEPOSITION TO JBJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.