Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Citation-ISSUED ON ABDALLAH RAHHAL-On 07/12/2018
Date: July 10, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** CITATION, Prot Order-ISSUED ON-On 07/11/2018
Date: July 10, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** TARRANT CO SERV REQ FORM
Date: July 10, 2018T.R.O.-ISSUED ON ABDALLAH RAHHAL. H/R 07/24/2018 - 08:30-On 07/12/2018
Date: July 10, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD 7/24/18 @ 830
Date: July 11, 2018TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD (HRG 7/24/18 @8:30A)
Date: July 12, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** SERVICE FEE, SUBSEQUENT Tr# 7 RET EXEC On 07/11/20 18
Date: July 13, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** SERVICE FEE, SUBSEQUENT Tr# 8 RET EXEC On 07/11/20 18
Date: July 13, 2018PROTECTIVE ORDER SUMMARY SHEET
Date: August 03, 2018Protective Order- TCIC form
Date: August 03, 2018FAX RECEIPTS
Date: August 07, 2018ADD'L TEMP ORDER REGARDING TEMP SPOUSAL MAINTENANC
Date: September 18, 2018Protective Order (Letter)-Created on 08/03/2018
Date: August 03, 2018TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: August 03, 2018PROTECTIVE ORDER (FAX COVER SHEET)-2ND ATTEMPT
Date: August 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING (HRG 9/24/18 @8:30AM)
Date: August 23, 2018INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC:C/S)
Date: August 27, 2018NOTICE OF FINAL TRIAL-9/4/19 @ 9:30AM
Date: September 24, 2018INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC:C/S)
Date: September 18, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: July 10, 2018RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER (ABDALLAH RAHHAL)
Date: July 17, 2018FINAL PROTECTIVE ORDER - EFFECTIVE UNTIL 8/2/2020
Date: August 03, 2018Citation Tr# 3 RET EXEC(ABDALLAH RAHHAL) On 07/13/2018
Date: July 19, 2018IV-D INTERVENTION
Date: November 20, 2018Protective Order (Fax Cover Sheet)-Created on 08/03/2018
Date: August 03, 2018ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: July 17, 2018MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: December 14, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** DOCKET SHEET
Date: August 03, 2018T.R.O. Tr# 5 RET EXEC(ABDALLAH RAHHAL) On 07/13/2018
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 1/16/19 8:30AM
Date: December 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING- 1/16/19 8:30AM
Date: December 17, 2018MOTION FOR INTERIM ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: December 14, 2018NOT HRG ON MTN FOR W/D OF COUNSEL- 1/16/19 8:30AM
Date: December 20, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER-A RAHHAL
Date: July 17, 2018APPEARANCE OF LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 14, 2018AGRED ORD TO EXTEND TRO (HRG 8/3/18 @8:30AM)
Date: July 24, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE
Date: August 03, 2018NOT OF HRG 1/11/19 8:30A MOT FOR INTERIM ATTY FEES
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING-2/14/19 @ 8:30AM
Date: February 05, 2019MOTION TO SELL MTR VEH, SEA DOO AND TRAILER
Date: February 04, 2019Costbill (Short) for $16-Due on 08/19/2018 ABDALLAH RAHHAL
Date: August 03, 2018PTNR'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISC DIRECTED TO RESP
Date: November 02, 2018(PROP) NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 14, 20181ST AMENDED COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: January 02, 2019(PROP) NOH ON MTN TO SELL (EMLD TO CT COORD)
Date: February 04, 2019PTNR'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISC DIRECTED TO RESP
Date: March 08, 2019NOTICE OF FINAL TRIAL-4/10/19 @ 8:30AM
Date: February 20, 2019Citation-ISSUED ON ABDALLAH RAHHAL-On 01/16/2019
Date: January 15, 2019ORD ON MTN FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Date: January 16, 2019MOTION FOR ENF OF TEMP SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE
Date: January 15, 2019CONFIRMATION LETTER-6/4/19 @ 8:30AM
Date: March 14, 2019(PROPOSED)ORDER TO APPEAR
Date: January 15, 2019ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL (MUMA)
Date: January 16, 2019Citation Tr# 82 RET OTHER(ABDALLAH RAHHAL) On 04/12/2019
Date: April 12, 2019JOINT NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: May 14, 2019(PROPOSED) ORD TO VACATE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 14, 2019ORD GRANTING MTN SELL MOTOR VEHICLE SEA DOO & TRLR
Date: February 14, 2019ORDER ON MTN TO VACATE PROTECTIVE ORD
Date: June 04, 20191ST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 08, 2019PROTECTIVE ORDER SUMMARY SHEET
Date: June 04, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING- 6/4/19 @8:30AM
Date: May 15, 2019(PROPOSED)NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 08, 2019Protective Order (Fax Cover Sheet)-Created on 06/04/2019
Date: June 04, 2019***FAX CONFIRMATIONS FROM SOME AGENCIES***
Date: June 04, 2019Vacate Letter-Created on 06/04/2019
Date: June 04, 2019***FAX CONFIRMATION FORM COBLE MIDDLE SCHOOL***
Date: August 09, 2019CONFIRMATION LETTER-2/20/19 @ 9AM
Date: February 14, 2019MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: August 16, 2018MOTION TO VACATE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 08, 2019RESP CERT OF WRITTEN DISC DIRECTED TO PTNR
Date: November 30, 2018AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TRO
Date: July 23, 2018RESP CERT OF WRITTEN DIS DIRECTED TO PTNR
Date: November 02, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND EXPARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 23, 2018MOTION FOR W/D OF COUNSEL-ATTY SMIEDT
Date: December 17, 2018*** From 322-644105-18 *** AN APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 10, 2018(PROPOSED) AGREED ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TRO
Date: July 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ***FAX CONFIRMATION FORM COBLE MIDDLE SCHOOL*** | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN TO VACATE PROTECTIVE ORD | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER SUMMARY SHEET | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Protective Order (Fax Cover Sheet)-Created on 06/04/2019 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ***FAX CONFIRMATIONS FROM SOME AGENCIES*** | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Vacate Letter-Created on 06/04/2019 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPIES - FAMILY | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #111 | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING- 6/4/19 @8:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.