Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bawa, Steve, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Youmtoub, Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Philip A. Champlin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions27 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 27 2009 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Bawa, S. vs. Youmtoub, S. et al. ; Judge: J21120 Champlin Philip A. Judge: Champlin, Philip A. |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant 211140-Fee Waiver Order-Grant Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per FEE WAIVER ORDER-GRANT [211140] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Application 211110-Fee Waiver Application Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per FEE WAIVER APPLICATION [211110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.