Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kerry E. Moseley filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryProbate - Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary      Index # 8
Date: January 30, 2017Application for Probate of Will      Index # 1
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice to Creditors Index # 16 Notice to Creditors Index # 16 |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 15 Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 15 |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 14 Correspondence Index # 14 |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 13 Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 13 |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 12 Affidavit Index # 12 |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 11 Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 11 |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 10 Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 10 |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Oath - Decedents Index # 9 Oath - Decedents Index # 9 |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Tes Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 8 Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 8 |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Death and other Facts Index # 7 Proof of Death and other Facts Index # 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.