Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arnier, Jeffery C. filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Ferchill, Patrick W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship Adult Transfers-In |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeGuardianship - Adult (Pr) |
Request      Index # 63
Date: March 31, 20201155 Motion for Payment of Costs      Index # 47
Date: July 10, 2018Judgment/Order      Index # 46
Date: June 28, 2018Order Appointing Court Visitor      Index # 55
Date: May 31, 2019Request      Index # 53
Date: April 02, 20191155 Order for Payment of Costs      Index # 49
Date: July 24, 2018Objection      Index # 50
Date: September 27, 2018Request      Index # 41
Date: March 15, 2018Request      Index # 32
Date: March 07, 2017Request      Index # 37
Date: June 30, 2017Order      Index # 36
Date: May 23, 2017Order      Index # 35
Date: May 18, 2017Motion      Index # 6
Date: October 22, 2015Deficiency Letter      Index # 5
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
306 Notice Index # 65 306 Notice Index # 65 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Guardian of Person Annual Report Index # 64 Order Approving Guardian of Person Annual Report Index # 64 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 63 Request Index # 63 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Guardian of the Person Annual Report Index # 62 Guardian of the Person Annual Report Index # 62 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
306 Notice Index # 61 306 Notice Index # 61 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Fees Index # 60 Order for Payment of Fees Index # 60 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for Payment of Fees Index # 59 Application for Payment of Fees Index # 59 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Visitor Report Index # 58 Court Visitor Report Index # 58 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Guardian of Person Annual Report Index # 57 Order Approving Guardian of Person Annual Report Index # 57 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
306 Notice Index # 56 306 Notice Index # 56 Judge: Ferchill, Patrick W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.