Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Public Notice filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryProbate - Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of C Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 12 Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 12 |
|
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Index # 11 Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Index # 11 |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 10 Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 10 |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice to Creditors Index # 9 Notice to Creditors Index # 9 |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Oath - Decedents Index # 8 Oath - Decedents Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Ferchill, Patrick W. ) |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Tes Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7 Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Ferchill, Patrick W. ) |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Handwriting & Signature Index # 6 Proof of Handwriting & Signature Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Ferchill, Patrick W. ) |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Death and other Facts Index # 5 Proof of Death and other Facts Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Ferchill, Patrick W. ) |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Probate Of Will Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ferchill, Patrick W.) Result: Order Signed | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing Setting Letter Index # 4 Hearing Setting Letter Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.