Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bumguardner, Mina filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship Adult |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Appointee Fees - County Pay Index # 13 Order for Payment of Appointee Fees - County Pay Index # 13 |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application for Payment of Fees Index # 12 Application for Payment of Fees Index # 12 |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Payment of Appointee Fees - County Pay Index # 11 Order for Payment of Appointee Fees - County Pay Index # 11 |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal of Investigation Index # 10 Order for Dismissal of Investigation Index # 10 |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem - Guardianships ONLY Index # 9 Report of Guardian Ad Litem - Guardianships ONLY Index # 9 |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application for Payment of Fees Index # 8 Application for Payment of Fees Index # 8 |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Temporary Guardianship Per Court Investigator CANCELED Temporary Guardianship (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer King, Steve M.) Per Court Investigator |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 6 Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 6 |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation - Poster Public Notice Served 09/20/2013 Returned 09/23/2013 | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation - Personal BUMGUARDNER, MINA Returned Unserved 09/25/2013 Returned 09/25/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.