Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryContract, Other Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PLTF'S ORIG PET
Date: April 06, 2021DEFNS ATTY'S WAIVER OF ISSUANCE & SVC OF PROCESS
Date: April 08, 2021(USDC) LTR OF REMAND
Date: June 30, 2021(USDC) ORDER OF REMAND
Date: June 30, 2021(USDC) CIVIL DOCKET 4:21-CV-00634-O
Date: June 30, 2021[ORIG ANS] ORIG ANS, DEFENSES & CNTRCLMS
Date: June 03, 2021***NOT OF FILING NOT OF REMOVAL***
Date: May 06, 2021PLTF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | (USDC) LTR OF REMAND | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | (USDC) ORDER OF REMAND | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | (USDC) CIVIL DOCKET 4:21-CV-00634-O | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | [ORIG ANS] ORIG ANS, DEFENSES & CNTRCLMS | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #8 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PLTF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | JURY FEE | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED trans #6 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ***NOT OF FILING NOT OF REMOVAL*** | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFNS ATTY'S WAIVER OF ISSUANCE & SVC OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.