Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil, Tarrant Appraisal District case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil, Tarrant Appraisal District |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
BLUE CARD
Date: February 12, 2008BLUE CARD
Date: January 16, 2008ORIG ANS (TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT & TARRANT
Date: September 24, 2007***AGREED JUDGMENT*** COSTS INCURRED
Date: January 16, 2008***FILE #1*** PLTF ORIG PET
Date: August 30, 2007AGRD MOT/CORRECT OR REFORM JDG
Date: February 04, 2008***AGREED JUDGMENT***
Date: February 12, 2008Citation-ISSUED ON TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT-On
Date: August 30, 2007CERT OF SERV
Date: August 30, 2007Citation-ISSUED ON TARRANT APPRAISAL REVIEW
Date: August 30, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Records File Return Form-Created on 04/02/2008 | |
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event | ***AGREED JUDGMENT*** | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | AGRD MOT/CORRECT OR REFORM JDG | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ***AGREED JUDGMENT*** COSTS INCURRED | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event | ORIG ANS (TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT & TARRANT | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | ***FILE #1*** PLTF ORIG PET | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation-ISSUED ON TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT-On |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.