Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil, Other case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil, Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
PLTF'S ORIG PET
Date: December 09, 2019PLTFS MTN TO TRANSFER
Date: December 20, 2019*TRO (BOND $100.00) HRG-12/30/19 11:00AM*
Date: December 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: December 20, 2019DEFNS' ORIG ANS (BRAXTON LLC & S BAUER)
Date: December 20, 2019LTR/BROYLES (EMAIL CITS)
Date: December 10, 2019DEFN'S MTN TO QUASH DEPO
Date: January 22, 2020(ATTACHE) (PROPOSED) ORD TO TRANSFER
Date: December 20, 2019CIT Tr# 3 RET EXEC(ROBERT SCOTT BAUER) On 12/16/20
Date: January 02, 2020CIT-ISSUED ON ROBERT SCOTT BAUER-On 12/11/2019
Date: December 09, 2019AFFDT OF SVC (BRAXTON MINERALS II LLC)
Date: January 02, 2020PLTFS 1ST AMD PET & APPL FOR TRO, TEMP INJUNCTION
Date: December 20, 2019CIT Tr# 6 RET EXEC(BRAXTON MINERALS II LLC) On 12/
Date: January 02, 2020CIT-ISSUED ON BRAXTON MINERALS II LLC-On
Date: December 10, 2019INTV'S REQ FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLTF
Date: January 13, 2020INTV BY RCVR FOR S BAUER & BRAXTON ACQUISITIONS,
Date: December 27, 2019BMIII'S SPEC/EXCS & ORIG ANS TO INTV'S XCLM
Date: January 21, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: January 02, 2020*TEMP INJ HRG 4-13-20 9:00AM*
Date: December 30, 2019NOT OF HRG 12/30/19 11AM-PLTF'S MTN TO TRANS
Date: December 24, 2019AFFDT OF SVC (ROBERT SCOTT BAUER)
Date: January 02, 2020DEFNS' OBJ TO PLTF'S MTN/TRANSFER
Date: December 23, 2019(ATTACHED) (PROPOSED) TRO
Date: December 20, 2019HRG NOT 01/31/20 11AM PLTF'S SPEC/EXC
Date: January 22, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD QUASHING DEPO JOHN BRADLEY ASHBURN
Date: January 22, 2020(SIGNED 12-30-19)***ORDR RE PLTF'S MTN/TRNSFR***
Date: January 02, 2020RECEIVER/INTV RESP TO BRAXTON MINERALS, III, LLC'S
Date: January 30, 2020PLTF'S 2ND AMD PET & APPL FOR TEMP & PERMANENT
Date: February 26, 2020DEFNS MTN TO QUASH DEPO
Date: February 03, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD QUASHING THE DEPO OF JOHN BRADLEY
Date: February 03, 2020*ORD ON PLTF'S SPEC/EXEC*
Date: January 31, 2020TRAD MTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: February 27, 2020NOT OF HRG 3/25/20 10AM-1ST AMD PLEA INTERVENTION
Date: March 17, 2020JM ENERGY'S 1ST AMD PLEA IN INTERVENTION
Date: March 16, 2020JM ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC'S PLEA IN INTERVENTION
Date: March 09, 2020NOT OF APPEARANCE (DEFNS)
Date: March 04, 2020NOT OF HRG 3/25/20 10AM-PLTFS MSJ
Date: February 28, 2020PLTF BRAXTON'S MTN TO STRIKE THE 1ST MD PLEA IN
Date: March 17, 2020DEFNS MTN FOR CONT OF MTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: March 17, 2020NOT OF HRG 3/25/20 10AM-CONT ON MSJ
Date: March 18, 2020LTR PART 2 WITH ATTACHED EX E-G
Date: February 27, 2020RESP TO DEFNS MTN FOR CONT ON SUM/JDG
Date: March 19, 2020JM ENERGY'S CORRECTED 1ST AMD PLEA IN INTVENTN
Date: March 20, 2020NOT OF HRG 3/25/20 10AM-STRIKE 1ST AMD PLEA IN
Date: March 17, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON MTN TO STRIKE PLEA IN
Date: March 25, 2020DEFNS RESP TO TRAD MSJ
Date: March 18, 2020ORIG CC (BAUER & BRAXTON II LLC)
Date: April 02, 2020LTR RE: PROPOSED ORD ON MTN TO STRIKE THE PLEA IN
Date: March 25, 2020*ORD GRANTING MTN TO STRIKE PLEA IN INERVENTION*
Date: March 25, 2020DEFNS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION/MTN TO DISM
Date: April 02, 2020AMD RESP TO PLTF'S TRAD MTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: April 02, 20201ST AMD ANS & VERIFIED DENIAL
Date: April 02, 2020PLTF'S OBJS TO DEFNS SUM/JDG EVID & MTN TO STRIKE
Date: April 03, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S OBJS TO DEFNS' SUM/JDG
Date: April 16, 2020PLTF REPLY TO DEFNS' AMDN RESP TO PLTF'S TRAD
Date: April 06, 2020LTR RE: PROPOSED ORD DENY PLTF'S MTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: April 20, 2020*SETTING ORD TRL WK OF 9/7/20*
Date: April 16, 2020BRAXTON MINERALS III LLC ORIG ANS TO DEFN'S CC
Date: April 27, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON BRAXTON MINERALS III LLC'S MSJ
Date: April 16, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S MTN TO STRIKE
Date: April 16, 2020NOT OF HRG 8/7/20 10AM-PLEA TO THE JURISDICTION/
Date: July 27, 2020PLTF MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON DEFN'S CC
Date: June 26, 2020LTR RE: ATTACHMENTS TO PLTFS MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON
Date: June 26, 2020COVER LTR RE: PROPOSED ORD
Date: April 16, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD DENY PLTF'S TRAD MTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: April 20, 2020VACATION LTR (ATTY SHAW)
Date: June 18, 2020NOT OF HRG 8/7/20 10AM-PLTFS MSJ ON DEFNS CC
Date: June 29, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON DEFNS PLEA TO JURISDICTIN/MTN
Date: August 06, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S MTN FOR SANCTIONS
Date: August 07, 2020*SETTING ORD TRL WK OF 11/30/20*
Date: September 15, 2020BRAXTON'S RESP TO DEFNS' PEAL TO JURISDICTN/MTN
Date: August 05, 2020MTN TO DESIGNATE J B ASHBURN & BMA AS 3RD PTY
Date: October 09, 2020DEFNS MTN TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT DOCS
Date: November 06, 2020ATTY LTR REQ CERT COPIES
Date: December 23, 2020DEFN RESP TO PLTF OBJ TO DEFNS DEMAND/JURY TRL
Date: August 06, 2020MTN TO W/D AS COUNSEL OF RECORD
Date: April 05, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING MTN FOR CONT
Date: March 23, 2021PLTF'S REPLY TO DEFNS RESP TO MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON
Date: August 06, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD GRANT MTN FOR CONT
Date: August 31, 2021RESP TO PLTF'S MSJ ON DEFNS CC
Date: July 30, 2020DEFNS DESIG OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: October 28, 2020PLTF'S OBJS TO DEFNS' REQ FOR JURY TRL
Date: August 05, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTFS OBJ TO DEFNS S/JDG EVID
Date: August 07, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S MTN FOR LEAVE
Date: August 07, 2020(PROPOSED) AMD ORD PERMITTING W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: April 06, 2021CTR PLTF'S UNOPPOSED 1ST MTN FOR CONT
Date: November 09, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON BRAXTON'S PARTIALMTN FOR SUM/JDG
Date: August 07, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING DEFN/CPLTF MTN FOR ENTRY
Date: December 07, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD ON DEFNS PLEA TO JURISDICTN/MTN TO
Date: August 07, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON DEFNS
Date: August 07, 2020*ORD ON DEFNS PLEA TO THE JURISDICTN/MTN TO DISM**
Date: November 20, 2020NOT OF HRG 1/12/22 12PM-MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON CC
Date: December 20, 2021NOT OF HRG 11/17/20 11AM-COMPEL SETTLEMENT DOCS
Date: November 06, 2020OBJ/MTN TO QUASH DEPO NOT
Date: October 09, 2020CERT/DEPO-ROBERT SCOTT BAUER-PLTF $234.75
Date: January 12, 2021DESG OF DEFNS/CNTR PLTFS EXPERTS
Date: December 20, 2021PLTFS OBJS TO DEFNS SUM/JDG EVID & MTN TO STRIKE
Date: August 06, 2020MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED & SUPPL SUM/JDG
Date: August 06, 2020(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING MTN FOR CONT
Date: November 09, 2020*ORD ON PLTF'S MSJ ON DEFNS CC (DENIED)*
Date: November 23, 2020*ORD GRANTING LEAVE TO CORRECT & SUPPL SJ EVID*
Date: August 07, 2020PLTF'S RESP TO DEFNS MTN TO COMPEL SETTLEMENT DOCS
Date: November 13, 2020NOT OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 27, 2021*ORD GRANT CONT TRL WK OF 1/31/22*
Date: September 02, 2021LTR RE: JURY FEES PAID
Date: September 16, 2020(PROPOSED)ORD GRANTING J ASHBURN & BMA 3RD PTYS
Date: October 09, 2020*ORD TO DESIG RESP 3RD DEFNS (J B ASHBURN & BM-
Date: November 17, 2020(PROPOSED) AGREED PROT ORD
Date: November 20, 2020NOT OF HRG 12/01/2021 11AM
Date: November 16, 2021*AGREED PROT ORD*
Date: November 23, 2020*ORD GRANTING CONT TRL WK OF 9/20/21*
Date: March 25, 2021ATTY LTR RE: AMD ORD
Date: April 06, 2021*ORD GRANTING CONT TRL WK OF 4/26/21*
Date: November 10, 2020PLTF'S UNOPPOSED 1ST MTN FOR CONT
Date: March 16, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD PERMITTING W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: April 05, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD (FILED IN WRONG CASE)
Date: June 18, 2021PLTFS UNOPPOSED MTN FOR CONT
Date: August 31, 2021NOT OF HRG-6/29/21 1:30PM-PLTFS MTN ORD EXECUTION
Date: June 18, 2021MTN TO RECONSIDER PLTF'S MTN FOR SUM/JDG ON DEFNS
Date: December 16, 2021BRAXTON MILERALS III LLC'S AMD ANS TO DEFNS CC
Date: December 15, 2021CERT/DEPO OF GREGORY WAYNE OLSON-DEFN $1,502.00
Date: March 16, 2021DEFN/COUNTER PLTFS MTN FOR ENTRY OF SCHD ORD
Date: October 28, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD
Date: November 15, 2021*ORD GRANTING IN PART DEFN/CTR PLT MTN FOR ENTRY
Date: December 16, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF'S MTN FOR S/J ON DEFNS CC
Date: December 16, 2021*ORD PERMITTING W/D OF COUNSEL*
Date: April 15, 2021MTN FOR EXPEDITED DISC & EXTENSION OF EXPERT
Date: December 20, 2021NOT OF HRG 01/19/22 11:00AM MTN FOR EXPEDITED
Date: December 21, 2021(PROPOSED) ORD GRANTING IN PART DEFN/CPLTF MTN FOR
Date: December 07, 2021PLTF RESP TO DEFN/XPLTF MTN FOR ENTRY OF SCH ORD
Date: November 15, 2021PLTFS REPLY TO DEFNS RESP TO MTN TO RECONSIDER
Date: January 10, 2022SUPPL DESG OF DEFNS/CNTR PLTFS EXPERTS
Date: January 14, 2022DEFNS RESP TO MTN/RECONSIDER PLTF'S MSJ ON
Date: January 05, 2022(PROPOSED) ORD DENY MTN/RECONSIDER PLTF'S MSJ
Date: January 05, 2022PLTF'S MTN FOR PROTECT ORD
Date: January 12, 2022(ATTACHED TO APPL FOR SUBP) DEUCES TECUM
Date: January 11, 2022PLTFS RESP TO MTN/EXPEDITED DISC & EXTENSION
Date: January 18, 2022PLTF'S DESIG OF EXCERPTS FROM DEPOS FOR USE AT TRL
Date: March 11, 2022*ORD OF REFERRAL*
Date: April 05, 2022Subpoena-ISSUED ON ANTERO RESOURCES CORPORATION-On
Date: January 11, 2022APPL FOR SUBP (WITNESS: ANTERO RESOURCES CORP)
Date: January 11, 2022(PROPOSED) ORD DENYING DEFN MTN FOR EXP DISC &
Date: January 28, 2022(PROPOSED) ORD ON PLTF (BRAXTON) MSJ ON DEFN CC
Date: January 28, 2022LTR TO JUDGE/COX (RESP TO SUPPL DESG OF DEFNS/
Date: January 14, 2022*ORD OF REFERRAL*
Date: March 02, 2022LTR TO JUDGE/HANEY (RESP TO LTR FROM OPPOSING
Date: January 17, 2022DEFAULT/COUNTER PLTF MTN TO RECUSE
Date: March 01, 2022***ORD SETTING HRG 6/29/22 @9:30
Date: June 09, 2022BM III LLC'S MTN TO STRIKE DEFNS' EXPERTS
Date: February 15, 2022APPL FOR SUBPOENA
Date: January 25, 2022(ATTACHED)EXHIBIT A 5-25_COMPRESSED_COMPRESSED
Date: May 25, 2022DEFNS/CTR PLTFS MTN TO RECUSE
Date: March 29, 2022(PROPOSED) ORD DENY DEFNS MTN/EXPEDITED DISC
Date: January 18, 2022(ATTACHED) DEUCES TECUM
Date: January 25, 2022PLTF'S MTN FOR PROT ORD AS TO DEFNS 2ND APPL FOR
Date: February 01, 2022***ORD ON PLTF'S MTN FOR S/J ON DEFNS'CC***
Date: January 27, 2022NOT OF HRG 3/3/22 10AM- PLTFS MTN TO STRIKE
Date: February 22, 2022***ORD OF REFERAL W/ATTACHED MTN
Date: June 03, 2022*ORD SUMMARILY DENYING DEFN/CTR PLTF'S MTN TO
Date: March 24, 2022DEFN/CPLTF AMD MTN TO RECUSE
Date: May 25, 2022*ORD REGARDING FILING AMD MTN TO RECUSE*
Date: April 25, 2022DEFNS/CPLT UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MTN FOR CONT
Date: June 14, 2022(ATTACHED)EXHIBIT B 5-25
Date: May 25, 2022***ORD RESETTING HRG 7/7/22 @ 9:30/AMD MTN RECUSE
Date: June 15, 2022**AMD ORD RESETTING HRG 7/7/22 @ 11:00/AMD MTN REC
Date: June 15, 2022ORD GRANT UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MTN CONT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 14, 2022PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S AMD MTN TO RECUSE
Date: June 29, 2022PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S MTN TO RECUSE (PART 2)
Date: June 29, 2022PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S AMD MTN TO RECUSE(PT.3)
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S AMD MTN TO RECUSE | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S MTN TO RECUSE (PART 2) | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S AMD MTN TO RECUSE(PT.3) | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ***ORD RESETTING HRG 7/7/22 @ 9:30/AMD MTN RECUSE | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | **AMD ORD RESETTING HRG 7/7/22 @ 11:00/AMD MTN REC | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFNS/CPLT UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MTN FOR CONT | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORD GRANT UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MTN CONT (PROPOSED) | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ***ORD SETTING HRG 6/29/22 @9:30 | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ***ORD OF REFERAL W/ATTACHED MTN | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | (ATTACHED)EXHIBIT A 5-25_COMPRESSED_COMPRESSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.