Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2013 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage, Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CITATION Tr# 3 RET EXEC(KATE COWLE) On 05/07/2013
Date: May 08, 2013PLTF'S CVR LTR RE: AGRD SCHEDULING ORD
Date: October 07, 2014STATEMENT OF CHRG AFFD [CHIRO DX/CLAR BOURGEOIS]
Date: June 04, 2013***PLTF'S MOT FOR PARTIAL SUM/JDG DENIED***
Date: June 27, 2014DEFN'S WITNESS LIST
Date: April 13, 2015PLTF ORIG PETITION
Date: April 03, 2013CERT/DEPO - CLARENCE BOURGEOIS $267.00
Date: October 03, 2014(PROPOSED) AGRD SCHEDULING ORD
Date: October 07, 2014CITATION-ISSUED ON KATE COWLE-ON 04/05/2013
Date: April 03, 2013DEFN'S [PROPOSED] CHARGE
Date: April 13, 2015ORIG ANS/RESPONSE [KATE COWLE]
Date: June 03, 2013INFORMATION SHEET
Date: April 03, 2013***ORD OF NONSUIT
Date: October 07, 2015CASE ON STANDBY FOR 4/14/15 9AM
Date: April 09, 2015TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING EXCLUSION OF PRE EXISTING
Date: April 13, 2015PLTF'S DEFINITIONS & JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: April 08, 2015*AGREED SCHED ORD TRIAL 4/13/15*
Date: November 05, 2014PLTF'S PRE TRIAL ORD
Date: April 07, 2015PLTF'S MOT TO EXCL PHOTOGRAPHS & PROPERTY DAMAGE
Date: April 07, 2015DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 07, 2015***ORDER FOR SUB SERVICE***
Date: May 02, 2013PLTF'S EXH LIST
Date: April 07, 2015LTR FROM THE COURT RE: FINAL JDG DUE 8/18/15
Date: August 18, 2015BUS REC AFFD [CHIRO DX RE: GAIL BOURGEIOUS]
Date: June 04, 2013PLTFS' NOT [W/ORD] OF NON-SUIT W/PREJ
Date: September 18, 2015MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMM JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2013MOT FOR SUB SERVICE W/AFFD
Date: April 25, 2013LETTER-VACATION [SCOTT RICHARD]
Date: June 20, 2013(PROPOSED)ORD ON DEFN'S MOT INLIMINE
Date: April 13, 2015PLTF'S MOT IN LIMINE
Date: April 07, 2015JURY FEE [LETTER FROM ATTORNEY]
Date: June 12, 2013CERT/DEPO - GAIL BOURGEOIS $267.00
Date: October 03, 2014DEFN'S RESP TO PLTF'S MOT FOR PARTIAL SUM JDG
Date: October 11, 2013RECS AFFDT - BEDFORD BACK & NECK CLINIC
Date: September 04, 2014LETTER-VACATION [SCOTT RICHARD]
Date: June 24, 2013STATEMENT OF CHRG AFFD [CHIRO DX/GAIL BOURGEOIS]
Date: June 04, 2013DEFN'S EXH LIST
Date: April 13, 2015LETTER B/W ATTY CONF HRG [10-18-13 9:30]
Date: September 16, 2013BUS REC AFFD [CHIRO DX/CLARENCE BOURGEOIS]
Date: June 04, 2013(PROPOSED) ORD OF NON-SUIT
Date: September 18, 2015DEFN'S MOT [W/ORD] IN LIMINE
Date: April 13, 2015***NOT OF DISM FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 07/10/14***
Date: May 30, 2014LTR FROM THE CT - PRE-TRL HRG [10/10/14 @ 9AM]
Date: September 04, 2014LTR: *HRG NOT* (06/27/2014 @ 11:30AM) PLTF'S MOT
Date: June 03, 2014BLUE CARD
Date: October 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ***ORD OF NONSUIT | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PLTFS' NOT [W/ORD] OF NON-SUIT W/PREJ | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) ORD OF NON-SUIT | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #65 | |
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event | E-FILE TRANSACTION FEE | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | LTR FROM THE COURT RE: FINAL JDG DUE 8/18/15 | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFN'S WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.