Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2015 |
CategoryContract, Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
MTN FOR DEFAULT JDG W/DEEMED REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: January 21, 2016DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 04, 2016CERT/LKA
Date: January 13, 2016PTLF ORG PET - ACCT
Date: October 28, 2015AFFDT IN SUPPORT OF SVC ON THE SEC OF ST
Date: November 24, 2015LTR FROM BLENDEN RE: DOCS FROM SEC OF ST
Date: November 24, 2015(PROPOSED) ORD
Date: January 21, 2016CERT/LKA
Date: January 21, 2016LTR FROM BLENDEN RE: SETTLED
Date: February 02, 2016CIT-ISSUED ON VICTORY WIRELINE LLC-On 10/30/2015
Date: October 28, 2015(PROPOSED) ORD
Date: January 13, 2016DOCKET SHEET
Date: January 29, 2016PLTF'S MTN TO MOD REFORM OR VACATE DEFAULT JDG
Date: February 22, 2016*INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JDG* C/EMAILED 1/28/16 TO BLENDEN
Date: January 27, 2016PROPOSED ORDER
Date: April 27, 2016PLTF'S ANNOUNCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT, ORD SETTING ASIDE JDG, ANNOUNCEMENT OF NONSUIT
Date: April 27, 2016CERT FROM SEC/STATE RE SERVICE ON VICTORY WIRELINELLC
Date: December 31, 2015CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: October 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ***ORD SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT JDG AND DISM W/O PREJ*** C/M AND EMAILED 5/5/16 TO BLENDEN | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PLTF'S ANNOUNCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT, ORD SETTING ASIDE JDG, ANNOUNCEMENT OF NONSUIT | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILE TRANSACTION FEE | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #40 | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PLTF'S MTN TO MOD REFORM OR VACATE DEFAULT JDG | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILE TRANSACTION FEE | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.