Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryContract, Other Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
(PROP)ORD CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP
Date: August 10, 2020LTR FROM RECV RE BOND
Date: July 13, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: August 12, 2020***ORD CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP***
Date: August 12, 2020APPL/CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP & DISCHARGE RECEIVER
Date: August 10, 2020***ORD APPNTNG RECV (MICHAEL S BERNSTEIN) & TO COMPEL DISCOVERY***
Date: June 25, 2020(PROP)ORD DENYING DEFNS' MTN/NEW TRIAL
Date: June 18, 2020OATH OF RECV
Date: July 13, 2020BOND OF RECV-TO BE MAILED IN
Date: July 13, 2020COVER LTR FOR RECEIVER'S APPL/CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP
Date: August 10, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: June 25, 2020***ORD DENYING DEFNS' MTN/NEW TRIAL***
Date: June 25, 2020PLTF'S RESP IN OPP TO DEFNS' MTN/NEW TRIAL
Date: June 18, 2020DEFNS' RESP TO PLTF'S MTN/POST-JDG RECV & MTN/ COMPEL DISCOVERY & PLEA/ABATEMENT
Date: June 17, 2020NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 6-24-20) DEFNS' MTN/NEW TRIAL
Date: June 11, 2020DEFN'S MTN/NEW TRIAL
Date: June 09, 2020RET'D MAIL-BRUCE MOORE-RTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADD'D-JDG NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: June 10, 2020***SCHED ORD RE MTN(S)(BY SUBM 6-24-2020)***
Date: June 08, 2020NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 6-24-20) PLTF'S MTN/POST-JDG RECEIVERSHIP
Date: June 05, 2020(PROP)ORD APPNTNG RECV & TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: June 03, 2020PLTF'S MTN/POST-JDG RECEIVERSHIP & MTN/COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: June 03, 2020ABSTRACT JUDG-ISSUED ON-On 06/02/2020
Date: June 01, 2020REQ/ABSTRACT
Date: June 01, 2020(PROP)JDG NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: April 30, 2020NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 5-29-2020) PLTF'S MTN/ENTRY JDG NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: May 06, 2020***JDG NUNC PRO TUNC***(COSTS TO DEFNS)
Date: May 29, 2020***SCHED ORD RE MTN(S)(BY SUBM 5-29-2020)***
Date: May 07, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: May 29, 2020MTN/ENTRY OF JDG NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: April 30, 2020DOCKET SHEET
Date: April 07, 2020ORD SIGNED 2-10-20 CLOSED CASE
Date: April 07, 2020***ORD GRNTNG PLTF'S MSJ***(COSTS TO DEFN)
Date: February 10, 2020RET'D MAIL-BRUCE MOORE ENTERPRISES INC-RTS NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADD'D/PRO-SE TRIAL DKT
Date: January 28, 2020***ORD RESET CASE/FINAL TRIAL (WK OF 6-22-20)***
Date: January 27, 2020PLTF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: January 21, 2020PLTF'S REQ/FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: January 21, 2020PLTF'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 21, 2020NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 1-30-20) PLTF'S TRAD & NE MSJ
Date: December 17, 2019AMD NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 1-22-20) PLTF'S TRAD & NE MSJ
Date: December 19, 2019(PROP)ORD GRNTNG PLTF'S MSJ
Date: December 16, 2019***SCHED ORD RE SJ MTN(S) (BY SUBM 1-22-20)***
Date: December 20, 2019PLTF'S TRAD & NO/EVID MSJ
Date: December 16, 2019TRIAL DKT MAILED TO PRO-SE DEFN BRUCE MOORE
Date: December 02, 2019TRIAL DKT MAILED TO PRO-SE DEFN BRUCE MOORE ENTERPRISES INC
Date: December 02, 2019TRIAL DKT MAILED TO PRO-SE DEFN SERVICE PROS AUTO CENTER LLC
Date: December 02, 2019***AMD ORD GRNTNG W/D OF COUNSEL FOR DEFNS*** (DARRELL W COOK & CATHERINE A KEITH)
Date: November 06, 2019(PROP)AMD ORD GRNTNG W/D OF DEFNS' COUNSEL
Date: October 31, 2019COVER LTR TO PROP AMD ORD GRNTNG W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: October 31, 2019***ORD GRNTNG W/D OF COUNSEL FOR DEFNS***
Date: October 23, 2019NOT/HRG (10-23-19/10:0)) DEFN'S ATTYS MTN W/D
Date: September 11, 2019LTR FROM ATTY TO CLIENT RE MTN TO W/D
Date: September 10, 2019COVER LTR TO MTN TO W/D & PROP ORD GRNTNG W/D
Date: September 04, 2019(PROP)ORD GRNTNG DEFN'S COUNSELS MTN TO W/D
Date: September 04, 2019DEFN'S COUNSELS MTN W/D-DARRELL W COOK & CATHERINEA KEITH
Date: September 04, 2019DEFNS' REPLY TO PLTF'S RESP TO DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: May 22, 2019(PROP)ORD DENYING DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: May 16, 2019PLTF'S RESP TO DEFNS' REPLY TO PTLF'S RESP TO DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: June 04, 2019COVER LTR TO DEFNS' REPLY
Date: May 22, 2019(PROP)ORD/DEFNS' OBJS TO PLTF'S SJ EVIDENCE
Date: June 04, 2019***ORD DENYING DEFNS' MTN/PARTIAL SJ***
Date: July 08, 2019PLTF'S RESP TO DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: May 16, 2019DEFN'S RESP TO PLTF'S REQ/PRIVELEGE LOG
Date: April 30, 2019VACATION LTR FROM ATTY KEITH
Date: April 30, 2019DEFN/CNTR-PLTF'S 2ND AMD ANS & CNTRCLAIMS
Date: April 25, 2019COVER LTR TO DEFN/CNTR-PLTF'S 2ND AMD ANS & CNTR- CLAIMS
Date: April 25, 2019NOT/HRG (BY SUBM 6-6-19) DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: April 22, 2019***SCHED ORD RE SJ MTN(S) (BY SUBM 6-6-19)***
Date: April 24, 2019DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ
Date: April 22, 2019COVER LTR TO DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ (ATTACHED TO DEFNS' MTN/PART SJ)
Date: April 22, 2019DEFN'S 1ST AMD ANS & CNTRCLAIMS
Date: April 18, 2019COVER LTR TO DEFN'S AMD ANS & CNTRCLAIMS
Date: April 18, 2019***ORD SET CASE FOR TRIAL (WK OF 1-27-20)***
Date: February 06, 2019DEFN'S ORIG ANS & CNTRCLAIMS
Date: January 22, 2019COVER LTR TO ORIG ANS & CNTRCLAIM
Date: January 22, 2019CIT Tr# 6 RET EXEC(BRUCE MOORE) On 12/26/2018
Date: December 28, 2018CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(BRUCE MOORE ENTERPRISES INC) On 12/26/2018
Date: December 28, 2018CIT Tr# 4 RET EXEC(SERVICE PROS AUTO CENTER LLC) On 12/26/2018
Date: December 28, 2018CIT RET OF SVC-BRUCE MOORE-EXEC 12-26-18
Date: December 28, 2018CIT RET OF SVC-BRUCE MOORE ENTERPRISES INC-EXEC 12-26-18
Date: December 28, 2018CIT RET OF SVC-SERVICE PROS AUTO CENTER LLC-EXEC 12-26-18
Date: December 28, 2018CIT-ISSUED ON BRUCE MOORE-On 12/20/2018
Date: December 18, 2018CIT-ISSUED ON BRUCE MOORE ENTERPRISES INC-On 12/20/2018
Date: December 18, 2018CIT-ISSUED ON SERVICE PROS AUTO CENTER LLC-On 12/20/2018
Date: December 18, 2018PLTF'S ORIG PET
Date: December 18, 2018LTR REQ CITATIONS (EMAIL)
Date: December 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ***ORD CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP*** | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROP)ORD CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | APPL/CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP & DISCHARGE RECEIVER | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER LTR FOR RECEIVER'S APPL/CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQ/CERT COPY OF ORD APPNTNG RECV-EMAIL (EMAILED TO JUSTIN@PLUNKSMITH.COM PER REQUEST/KB) | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #98 | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPIES - ELECTRONIC | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Registry Investment | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CASH BOND - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.