Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Other Civil, Other case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil, Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT) On 01/19/2017
Date: February 01, 2017AGRD JDG
Date: March 15, 2017DEFN'S ORIG ANS
Date: February 01, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: March 15, 2017***AGREED JDG*** (COST INCURRED)
Date: March 15, 2017***ORD SET CASE FOR SCHED CONF (3-29-17/3:00)***
Date: March 03, 2017SERVICE REQ FORM
Date: December 30, 2016CIT-ISSUED ON TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT-On 01/06/2017
Date: December 30, 2016CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: December 30, 2016PLTF'S ORIG PET
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | AGRD JDG | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ***AGREED JDG*** (COST INCURRED) | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ***ORD SET CASE FOR SCHED CONF (3-29-17/3:00)*** | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT) On 01/19/2017 | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFN'S ORIG ANS | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SERVICE REQ FORM | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CIT-ISSUED ON TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT-On 01/06/2017 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.