Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with J. Patrick Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2012 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage, Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUBPOENA NOT ISSUED BY THIS OFFICE-JENNIFER FLICK
Date: February 05, 2013MEDICAL RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (JPS-VIOLA PITS COMO)
Date: January 28, 2013NOT/TAKE DEPO OF OFCR WAYNE ESTES
Date: December 21, 2012MEDICAL RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (MEDSTAR)
Date: January 28, 2013Accounting Yes Money Adjustment Form-Created on 07
Date: July 23, 2012NOT OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO (DAVID GRISSOM MD)
Date: August 27, 2012MOT TO SUB COUNSEL
Date: October 10, 2012NOT/TAKE DEPO (STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL INS CO
Date: June 20, 2012BILLING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (MEDSTAR)
Date: January 28, 2013NOT/TAKE DEPO (JPS HEALTH NETWORK)
Date: June 20, 2012CERT/DEPO OF JPS HEALTH NETWORK MED DEFN 1256.14
Date: January 31, 2013NOT OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS & FIRM NAME
Date: August 07, 2012*AGRD SCHED ORDER/TRIAL SET 3-18-13** (MLD COPY
Date: July 18, 2012CERT/DEPO OF REPUBLIC HOME PROTECTERS INC PD DEFN
Date: September 04, 2012*ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING ON 3/18/13**
Date: January 02, 2013LTR RE:(AGRD ORDER OF DISM & NONSUIT W/PREJ)
Date: June 27, 2013Citation W/SVC Tr# 2 RET EXEC(DEANNA HAILEY) On 04
Date: April 16, 2012BILLING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (RADCARE OF TX PA)
Date: January 28, 2013INFORMATION SHEET
Date: March 30, 2012NOT/TAKE DEPO (REPUBLIC HOME PROTECTERS INC)
Date: June 20, 2012CERT/DEPO OF STATE FARM CO MUTUAL INS CO PD DEFN
Date: August 20, 2012AMD NOT/TAKE DEPO (JPS HEALTH NETWORK)
Date: August 30, 2012PLTF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 30, 2012DEFN'S WITNESS LIST
Date: March 01, 2013BILLING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (TARRANT EMER PHYS)
Date: January 28, 2013*ORDER GRANTING SUB OF CNSL*
Date: October 10, 2012BILLING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (UNT HLTH PHY GROUP)
Date: January 28, 2013BILLING RECORDS AFFIDAVIT (JPS PHY GROUP,INC)
Date: January 28, 2013PLTFS SECOND AMD ORIG PET
Date: April 03, 2013CERT/DEPO-JENNIFER FLICK-$197.95-DEFN
Date: April 11, 2013DEFN'S PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 01, 2013LTR RE:(ORDR NONSUIT W/O PREJ,AGRD ORDR DISM)W/ORD
Date: May 20, 2013***DOCKET SHEET***
Date: May 20, 2013BLUE CARD
Date: May 20, 2013SUBPOENA NOT ISSUED BY THIS OFFICE-OFCR WAYNE
Date: February 05, 2013DEFN'S MOT IN LIMINE
Date: March 01, 2013(FAXED) PLTFS PROPOSED COURT'S CHARGE
Date: February 28, 2013CERT/DEPO OF STATE FARM CO MUTUAL INS PD DEFN
Date: August 20, 2012NOT OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPO (CTRS FOR MEDICARE &
Date: November 26, 2012PLTF'S 1ST AMD ORIG PET & REQ/DISCLOSURE
Date: July 18, 2012CERT/DEPO OF RICHARD WARREN PAYNE PD DEFN $360.15
Date: December 19, 2012(FAXED) PLTFS EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 28, 2013DEFN'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 01, 2013NOT/TAKE DEPO OF JENNIFER FLICK
Date: December 21, 2012CERT/DEPO-DEANNA HAILEY-$269.15-PLTF
Date: February 11, 2013*ORDER SETTING FOR SCHED CONF 7-18-12 3:00 PM*
Date: May 14, 2012Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON DEANNA HAILEY-On
Date: March 30, 2012ORIG ANS (DEANNA HAILEY)
Date: May 07, 2012NOT OF APPEARANCE (J PATRICK GALLAGHER)
Date: July 18, 2012(FAXED) PLTFS WITNESS LIST
Date: February 28, 2013***AGRD ORDER OF DISM & NONSUIT W/PREJ, COST TAXED
Date: May 20, 2013LET TO THE COURT-REQUEST EXTENSION
Date: April 08, 2013CERT/DEPO OF OFFICER WAYNE ESTES-DEFN $168.90
Date: March 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | LTR RE:(AGRD ORDER OF DISM & NONSUIT W/PREJ) | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | LTR RE:(ORDR NONSUIT W/O PREJ,AGRD ORDR DISM)W/ORD | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ***DOCKET SHEET*** | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ***AGRD ORDER OF DISM & NONSUIT W/PREJ, COST TAXED | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERT/DEPO-JENNIFER FLICK-$197.95-DEFN | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | LET TO THE COURT-REQUEST EXTENSION | |
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PLTFS SECOND AMD ORIG PET | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CERT/DEPO OF OFFICER WAYNE ESTES-DEFN $168.90 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.