Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lodge On Broadway, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Ferguson, Dominique, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Dunklin, Andy Judgment of $5,049.00Awarded To: LODGE ON BROADWAYAwarded Against: DOMINIQUE FERGUSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDunklin, Andy Judgment of $5,049.00Awarded To: LODGE ON BROADWAYAwarded Against: DOMINIQUE FERGUSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2024 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment for Plaintiff | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Email Correspondence | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL BY JUDGE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial by Judge (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunklin, Andy) | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Alternate Service Returned Served | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Alternate Service Request | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Eviction Citation Issued |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation - Eviction FERGUSON, DOMINIQUE Served 02/20/2024 | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.