Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Montex Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Taylor, Latisha, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Dunklin, Andy Judgment of $3,600.00Awarded To: Montex ManagementAwarded Against: LaTisha Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDunklin, Andy Judgment of $3,600.00Awarded To: Montex ManagementAwarded Against: LaTisha Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL BY JUDGE | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial by Judge (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunklin, Andy) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Email Correspondence | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Alternate Service Returned Served | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Alternate Service Request Order for Alternate Service |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation - Eviction Taylor, LaTisha Served 01/23/2024 | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Eviction Citation Issued |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.