Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Simpson, Alice, filed a(n) Eviction case represented by James E. Williams, against Stephens, Tina, Stephens, David, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial by Judge (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunklin, Andy)
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation - Eviction STEPHENS, DAVID Served 03/24/2023 STEPHENS, TINA Served 03/24/2023
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Dunklin, Andy JudgmentAwarded To: ALICE SIMPSONAwarded Against: DAVID STEPHENS, et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.