Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Us Lloyds Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Stan Marquardt, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brian D. Garner, against Craig, Delwin W., Howard, Lisa, Lynch, Quenton, Pena, Matias, Wells, James, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 3 with Clay M. White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClay M. White Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2024 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 3 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss - Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer White, Clay) | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request Jury Trial Jury Fee |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer - QUENTON LYNCH Answer |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Clk-Atty Vacation Ltr Vacation Letter |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on 03/28/24 Notice of Hearing |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served Q.Lynch Citation Returned Served |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Letter to the Court Coordinator Requesting Hearing Notice |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MATIAS PENA Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO DISMISS MATIAS PENA Proposed Order |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pena's Original Answer Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.