Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Eagle Creek Ranch, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Susan Johnson Foster, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Jason A. Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2023 |
CategoryJp Appeal |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ellis, Jason) | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CCL NOS2 - AMENDED Amended Notice |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CCL NOS2 Notice of Setting |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Green Card Returned Served | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPEALS - Notice of Appeal Notice of Appeal |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Inability to Afford Court Costs | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Civil Proceedings (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.